Hobbs v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janis Hobbs
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00121
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Janis Hobbs. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company served on 4/2/2020. (Hartness, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/14/2020 and Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro, Arkansas Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge Lee P. Rudofsky. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/23/2020. (hml)
April 21, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove the reference to a Jury Demand. (thd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Puryear, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey W. Puryear on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Puryear, Jeffrey)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Mayfield on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company (Mayfield, Mark)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(wbb)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Janis Hobbs.(wbb) (Docket text modified on 4/21/2020 to remove the reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd).
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company from Independence County Circuit Court, case number 32CV-20-36. Fee of $400 paid, receipt #JON000895. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hobbs v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Mark Alan Mayfield
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Puryear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janis Hobbs
Represented By: Matthew Eugene Hartness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?