Hausers Water Systems Inc v. FCCI Insurance Company
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hausers Water Systems Inc and Hausers Water Systems Inc
Defendant: FCCI Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00122
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Hausers Water Systems Inc (Moore, Barrett)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/29/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 8/11/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 11/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 05/28/2020. (rmg)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by FCCI Insurance Company (Grace, David)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by FCCI Insurance Company.(Grace, David)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Grace on behalf of FCCI Insurance Company (Grace, David)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Hausers Water Systems Inc. FCCI Insurance Company served on 5/4/2020. (Moore, Barrett)
April 24, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint and #2 Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the Plaintiff's name to be Hausers Water Systems Inc. (thd)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin P. Short. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 04/23/2020. (rmg)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Justin P. Short. Fee $100.00 paid, Receipt Number LIT076936. Filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hausers Water Systems Inc (jap)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FCCI Insurance Company, filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hausers Water Systems Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT076936. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hausers Water Systems Inc v. FCCI Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Hausers Water Systems Inc
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: Justin P. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hausers Water Systems Inc
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Represented By: Justin P. Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?