Hastings v. Wilbur et al
Plaintiff: Steven Hastings
Defendant: Kimberley Brown, Steven R Puckett, Alec J Wilbur, Lori Reaves, Nurzuhal Faust, Justin Nathaniel Peter, Marvorrie Hall, Shawn Richard, Reed D Marshall, Jerremy Wilson and Andrew Schubert
Case Number: 3:2020cv00160
Filed: June 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER overruling Hastings's embedded objection about being denied counsel, Doc. #19 . The Court adopts the partial recommendation, #5 , and supplemental partial recommendation #14 as modified. The Court directs the Clerk to amend the docket to reflect that Doc. #7 is a supplement to Doc. #4 . Hastings may proceed with the claims against Brown and Hall in his #4 amended complaint, the claims against Richard and Wilson in his #7 supplement, and the claims against Wilbur and Puckett in both. The official capacity damages claims against Wilbur and Puckett are dismissed without prejudice. And all claims against Faust, Schubert, Reaves, Peter, and Marshall are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2020. (jak)
July 22, 2020 Filing 19 OBJECTIONS to #5 and #14 Proposed Findings and Recommendations and 15 Order by Steven Hastings. (llg)
July 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Answer. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to remove duplicate text.(jak)
July 20, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, #7 Amended Complaint, #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Steven R Puckett, Alec J Wilbur.(Land, Amanda) (Docket text modified on 7/22/2020 to remove duplicate text)(jak)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for order #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/17/2020. (lej)
July 15, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Order by Steven Hastings. (kdr)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion to appoint counsel #8 . A civil litigant does not have a constitutional or statutory right to appointed counsel in a civil action but the Court may appoint counsel at its discretion. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(1). The Court has considered Plaintiff's need for an attorney, the likelihood that Plaintiff will benefit from assistance of counsel, the factual complexity of the case, the Plaintiff's ability to investigate and present the case, and the complexity of the legal issues. In considering these factors, the Court finds that Plaintiff's claims do not appear legally or factually complex, and it appears Plaintiff is capable of prosecuting these claims without appointed counsel. After careful consideration of Plaintiff's motion for mental health examination and motion for order, I find they should be denied at this time #9 #10 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/15/2020. (lej)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS that the claims in Plaintiff's second amended complaint against Defendant Reaves be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Defendant Reaves be dismissed from this action. The claims in Plaintiff's second amended complaint against Defendant Schubert be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. Defendant Schubert be dismissed from this action. The claims in Plaintiff's second amended complaint against Defendants Puckett, Wilbur, Hall, and Faust be dismissed for failure to state a claim. The claims in Plaintiff's second amended complaint against Defendants Peter and Marshall be dismissed without prejudice as improperly joined. The Court certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/15/2020. (lej)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Clerk prepare summons and the USM serve Defendants Wilson and Richard without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/15/2020. (lej)
July 15, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Denise Land on behalf of Steven R Puckett, Alec J Wilbur (Land, Amanda)
July 15, 2020 Summons Issued as to Shawn Richard, Jerremy Wilson and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Steven Hastings. (ljb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Order by Steven Hastings. (ljb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Mental Health Examination by Steven Hastings. (ljb)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Steven Hastings. (ljb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENT re #4 Amended Complaint filed by Steven Hastings. (ljb) [Docket entry modified to correct the Filing Event pursuant to #20 Order] (jak)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare Summons for Defendants Wilbur, Brown, Puckett, and Hall; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the #4 Amended Complaint, Summons, and this Order on each of them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/24/2020. (jbh)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending Plaintiff's official capacity damages claims against Defendants Wilbur, Puckett, Faust, Peter, and Marshall claims be dismissed without prejudice; recommending Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Faust, Wilson, Schubert, Reaves, Richard, Peter, and Marshall be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; recommending Defendants Faust, Wilson, Schubert, Reaves, Richard, Peter, and Marshall be dismissed from this action; and recommending the Court certify that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations would not be taken in good faith. Objections due no later than 14 days from the date of the findings and recommendations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/24/2020. (jbh)
June 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Kimberley Brown, Marvorrie Hall, Steven R Puckett, Alec J Wilbur and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Steven Hastings. (llg)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's present custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward them to the Clerk of Court until the total $350 has been collected. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the North Central Unit, the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, and the ADC Compliance Office. The Clerk of Court is directed to send Plaintiff a blank 1983 complaint form. If Plaintiff wishes to amend his complaint, he may submit the new complaint in accordance with this Order, mark it as "Amended Complaint" and file it within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 6/11/2020. (jak)
June 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Steven Hastings. (llg)
June 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Steven Hastings. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hastings v. Wilbur et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Hastings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberley Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven R Puckett
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alec J Wilbur
Represented By: Amanda Denise Land
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lori Reaves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurzuhal Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Justin Nathaniel Peter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvorrie Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Richard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reed D Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerremy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Schubert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?