Barron v. Tate
Plaintiff: Deursla Lashay Barron
Defendant: Curtis Tate
Case Number: 3:2020cv00188
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER of USCA as to 9 Notice of Appeal filed by Deursla Lashay Barron: The Clerk of the district court is requested to forward to this Court forthwith any portions of the original record which are not available in an electronic format through PACER. (ajt)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER of USCA as to 9 Notice of Appeal filed by Deursla Lashay Barron: The $505 appellate filing and docketing fee has not been paid and is due. Appellant is directed to pay the fee in the district court or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis in this court within 28 days of this order. (ajt)
September 14, 2020 Filing 12 USCA Docketing Letter as to 9 Notice of Appeal filed by Deursla Lashay Barron. USCA Case Number 20-2903. (ajt)
September 11, 2020 Filing 11 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 9 Notice of Appeal re #3 Order and #4 Judgment. (ajt)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Plaintiff's motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis; directing Plaintiff, within 30 days of this order's entry date, to either (a) pay to this Court the $505.00 appellate filing and docketing fees; or file, with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit, a motion with an attached affidavit that complies with each mandate of Federal Rule of Appellate Procedure 24(a)(1); and directing Plaintiff to file any future documents or pleadings related to his appeal with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 09/11/2020. (ajt)
September 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order and #4 Judgment by Deursla Lashay Barron. (No separate document attached, see docket entry #8 .) (ajt)
September 9, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Deursla Lashay Barron. (ajt)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion for Copies. The Clerk is directed to send Barron a blank petition for a writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241. All other relief requested is denied. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/6/2020. (jak)
August 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Copies by Deursla Lashay Barron. (llg)
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 JUDGMENT pursuant to #3 Order, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice; the relief sought is denied. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/20/2020. (jak)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Barron's custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $1.03 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Center. Barron's claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Barron's #2 Complaint with be dismissed without prejudice. This dismissal counts as a "strike" and the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal taken from this Order and accompanying Judgment is considered frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/20/2020. (jak)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Curtis Tate filed by Deursla Lashay Barron. (llg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Deursla Lashay Barron. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deursla Lashay Barron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Tate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?