Neal v. Arkansas, State of et al
Plaintiff: Andrew C Neal, Jr
Defendant: Mark Counts, Serena Martin, Arkansas Supreme Court, Ryan Cooper, Joe Grider, III, Arkansas, State of, Harold Erwin, Michelle Huff, Henry Boyce, Bobby Glenn, Sloan Lane, Rita Woods, Joyce Wheeler, Alisa Black and Arron Presser
Case Number: 3:2020cv00200
Filed: July 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER after careful consideration of Plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction, I find it must be denied for failure to comply with Rule 65(a)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure #14 . However, Plaintiff may provide only one copy of his pleadings rather than two as stated in the Recommended Disposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 9/15/2020. (lej)
September 15, 2020 Filing 15 OBJECTIONS to #11 Report and Recommendations by Andrew C Neal, Jr (Attachments: #1 Objections Part 2).(kdr)
September 15, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST for Injunction Order by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (kdr)
August 31, 2020 Summons Issued as to Mark Counts, Serena Martin and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summons for Defendants Counts and Martin. The U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the #9 amended complaint, summons, and this Order on each of them without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/31/2020. (jak)
August 31, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Proposed Findings and Recommendations. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #11 and is attached hereto for service on the parties.(jak)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's claims against the State of Arkansas, Arkansas Supreme Court, and Defendants Michelle Huff, Harold Erwin, Joe Grider III, Henry Boyce, and Ryan Cooper be dismissed without prejudice as improperly joined and they be dismissed as parties from this lawsuit. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Rita Woods, Joyce Wheeler, Sloan Lane, Bobby Glenn, Arron Presser, and Alisa Black should be dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted and they be dismissed as parties from this lawsuit.The Court should certify, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting these recommendations and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/31/2020. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/31/2020: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
August 25, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (llg)
August 25, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (llg)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying Plaintiff's motion for recusal as frivolous #7 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/21/2020. (lej)
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Recusal and Response to #6 Order by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (ljb)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to mail plaintiff a 1983 complaint form. Plaintiff may complete the new complaint form in its entirety and file it within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 8/12/2020. (jak)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (llg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Andrew C Neal, Jr. (llg)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number LIT078412. (Original receipt mailed.) (llg)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff must submit either the $400 filing fee or a complete Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit within 30 days of the date of this order. Failure to do one or the other will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit along with a copy of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 7/27/2020. (lej)
July 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Andrew C Neal, Jr.(kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Arkansas, State of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Serena Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Supreme Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joe Grider, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Erwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Huff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Boyce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sloan Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Wheeler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alisa Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arron Presser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew C Neal, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?