Webster v. Perrin
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Defendant: Harold Perrin
Case Number: 3:2020cv00235
Filed: August 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 10 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
September 30, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the document was filed in error (duplicate entry) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was previously filed and docket entry #7 Order.(jak)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 JUDGMENT consistent with #7 Order, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/2020. (jak)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (ljb) (Docket text modified on 9/30/2020 to indicate the document was filed in error)(jak)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions for copies and directing the Clerk to send Webster the docket sheet and docket entries #1 , #2 , #3 , 4 , #5 , and #6 , as well as this Order. Webster's #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis is denied. This case is dismissed without prejudice. If Webster wants to pursue these claims, he must first pay the filing fee of $400 to the clerk, noting the above style and case number, within thirty days of the date of this order along with a motion to reopen this case. Upon receipt of the full filing fee and his motion, this case will be reopened. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order and accompanying judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 9/30/2020. (jak)
September 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Copies by Gary Leon Webster. (kdr)
September 14, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Copies by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb)
August 19, 2020 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Brian S. Miller. (jak)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign this case at random by chip exchane. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 08/19/2020. (ajt)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Harold Perrin filed by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gary Leon Webster. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webster v. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Leon Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?