Nixon v. Molder et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Nixon, Jr
Defendant: Kevin Molder and Val Price
Case Number: 3:2020cv00238
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE to the Court by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (jak)
October 2, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE to the Court by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (kdr)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Extend Time; denying #9 Motion to Extend Time. Nixon may file his complaint as a new case after his release. if he wishes, and pay the filing fee at that time. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2020. (jak)
September 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Extend Time by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (kdr)
September 2, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Extend Time by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (kdr)
August 31, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (llg)
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
August 24, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT: Nixon's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Nixon's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. If Nixon wants to pursue this case, then he must pay the $400 filing and administrative fees and file a motion to reopen this case by 9/25/2020. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 ADDENDUM to #1 IFP Motion filed by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (ljb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (ljb)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Nixon, Jr. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Molder et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Molder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Val Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Nixon, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?