Jones v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Kristie Jones
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00240
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
September 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kristie Jones. Social Security Administration served on 9/11/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
September 3, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/3/2020. (jak)
August 20, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file and docket the Complaint, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor, and issue summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 8/20/2020. (jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Kristie Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristie Jones. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kristie Jones
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?