Hackworth v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hackworth
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2020cv00241
Filed: August 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric B. Tucker on behalf of Social Security Administration (Tucker, Eric)
September 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jennifer Hackworth. Social Security Administration served on 9/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Beth Deere. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/22/2020. (jak)
August 24, 2020 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Ms. Hackworth's counsel is directed to prepare a summons, to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 8/24/2020. (jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by Jennifer Hackworth. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)
August 19, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jennifer Hackworth.(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hackworth v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Eric B. Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Hackworth
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?