Jones v. Boyd et al
Plaintiff: Trista Jones
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC, John Does, Marty Boyd, Sandy Carmichael and MobilexUSA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00265
Filed: September 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2020 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 12/11/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 10/27/2020. (slb)
October 22, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(Wankum, Mark)
October 22, 2020 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #13 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT" as marked on the document. (jak)
October 21, 2020 Summons Issued as to MobilexUSA and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
October 21, 2020 Filing 13 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Trista Jones(Sutter, Luther) (Docket text modified on 10/22/2020 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 and #11 Motions for Jones to drop all her claim against Turn Key except her medical malpractice claim, and to amend her complaint to add Sandy Carmichael as a defendant. #6 Motion to dismiss is denied as moot. Amended Complaint due by 10/21/2020. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2020. (jak)
September 16, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Amended Complaint by Trista Jones (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Proposed 2nd Amended Complaint)(Sutter, Luther)
September 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Motion for Partial Dismissal by Trista Jones (Sutter, Luther)
September 1, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC.(ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss in part by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC. (ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Marty Boyd.(ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Trista Jones.(ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Marty Boyd.(ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Trista Jones.(ajt)
September 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Turn Key Health Clinics LLC from Craighead County Circuit Court, case number 16JCV-19-1174. Fee $400 paid, receipt number LIT078704. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Boyd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turn Key Health Clinics LLC
Represented By: Mark D. Wankum
Represented By: Amelia C. Botteicher
Represented By: Amelia F. Botteicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marty Boyd
Represented By: Jason E. Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Carmichael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MobilexUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trista Jones
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?