Cote v. Franks et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Cote
Defendant: Wesley Manning, Steve Franks and Brent Cox
Case Number: 3:2020cv00370
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Copies filed by Ronnie Cote. (fjg)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brent Cox, Steve Franks, Wesley Manning, filed by Ronnie Cote(jap)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/14/2020. (hml)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and granting #3 Motion for copies. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of his Complaint, the docket sheet, and this Order to Plaintiff. Mr. Cote has thirty (30) days to file an Amended Complaint as directed above. The failure to timely file an Amended Complaint may result in the dismissal of some of the claims. Signed by Judge Lee P. Rudofsky on 12/14/2020. (wbb)
December 7, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Copies filed by Ronnie Cote. (fjg)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronnie Cote.(ajt)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie Cote. (ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cote v. Franks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Cote
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?