Banks v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Leah Banks
Defendant: Keith Bowers and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00018
Filed: January 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: J Thomas Ray
Referring Judge: Lee P Rudofsky
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leah Banks. (kdr)
January 26, 2021 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #3 Order. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed as "INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS" as marked on the Order. (jak)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying #1 IFP motion and directing the Clerk to send Plaintiff another IFP application, an inmate account calculation sheet, and a certificate of your inmate account, along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 01/25/2021. (wbb)(Docket text modified on 1/26/2021 to correct the description of the document filed) (jak)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Leah Banks. (kdr)
January 21, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leah Banks. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?