Smullins/Craft v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Johni Danielle Smullins/Craft
Defendant: Keith Bowers and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00034
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Summons Issued as to Keith Bowers and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Bowers. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the #2 Complaint, the Court's Partial Recommended Disposition and this Order on him at the Craighead County Detention Center, without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/6/2021. (jak)
April 6, 2021 Filing 6 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending Smullins/Craft be allowed to proceed with her conditions of confinement against Bowers; Smullins/Craft's claim against the CCDC be dismissed with prejudice #2 ; Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/6/21. (tjb)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from plaintiff's institutional account and forward to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Craighead County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 3/30/2021. (jak)
March 8, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johni Danielle Smullins/Craft. (llg)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying without prejudice #1 IFP Motion; directing the Clerk to send plaintiff another IFP application, an inmate account calculation sheet, and a certificate of your inmate account, along with a copy of this Order; directing plaintiff to complete and sign the IFP application, have an authorized jail/prison official complete and sign the institutional account certificate and calculation sheet, and return all forms to the Clerk on or before 3/12/2021; and directing Craighead County Detention Center officials to assist you in completing the necessary forms. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2021. (ljb)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Johni Danielle Smullins/Craft.(kdr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Johni Danielle Smullins/Craft. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smullins/Craft v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johni Danielle Smullins/Craft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?