Truitt v. Bowers et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Doyle Truitt
Defendant: Keith Bowers and Craighead County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2021cv00035
Filed: February 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ashley Doyle Truitt re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoners, Complete IFP form. (fjg)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS denying without prejudice #1 IFP Motion; directing the Clerk to send plaintiff another IFP application, an inmate account calculation sheet, and a certificate of your inmate account, along with a copy of this Order; directing plaintiff to complete and sign the IFP application, have an authorized jail/prison official complete and sign the institutional account certificate and calculation sheet, and return all forms to the Clerk on or before 3/12/2021; and directing Craighead County Detention Center officials to assist you in completing the necessary forms. Service is not appropriate at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 2/12/2021. (ljb)
February 8, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ashley Doyle Truitt.(kdr)
February 8, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ashley Doyle Truitt. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Truitt v. Bowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Doyle Truitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?