Boyles et al v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sierra Elliott and Tommy Boyles
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Dustin Wardlow, Michelle L Turner, Ricky Jefferson and Tony Turner
Case Number: 3:2021cv00092
Filed: May 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/16/2021. Jury Trial set for 12/12/2022 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 6/3/2021. (slb)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Michelle L Turner, Tony Turner.(Smith, Thomas)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Benton Smith, Jr on behalf of Michelle L Turner, Tony Turner (Smith, Thomas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Stay Proceedings in State Court by Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Ricky Jefferson, Dustin Wardlow. (ajt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Ricky Jefferson, Dustin Wardlow.(ajt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Tommy Boyles, Sierra Elliott.(ajt)
May 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Blytheville Arkansas, City of, Ricky Jefferson, Dustin Wardlow from Mississippi County Circuit Court, case number 47BCV-21-64(TA). Fee $402 paid, receipt number LIT082012. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyles et al v. Blytheville Arkansas, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blytheville Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Wardlow
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle L Turner
Represented By: Thomas Benton Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Jefferson
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tony Turner
Represented By: Thomas Benton Smith, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Elliott
Represented By: Jacob Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tommy Boyles
Represented By: Jacob Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?