Coleman et al v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Vito Scarola, Melissa Dinovi, Tiffany Neal, Baylee Schaefer, Anthony Harrison, Galena Gutierrez, Dominick Grossi, Brandi Coleman and Felicia Dykes
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00115
Filed: June 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting as modified 24 joint motion to consolidate and for other relief. The Court designates 3:21-cv-82 DPM as the lead case. Joint motion to appoint interim class counsel due by 9/20/2021. Consolidated complaint due by 11/17/2021. 18 Motion to dismiss denied without prejudice as moot. Stays lifted, but Walmart need not respond in 3:21-cv-115 DPM. Walmart's answer or Rule 12(b) motion is due 30 days after the consolidated complaint is filed. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/19/2021. (jak)
August 19, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 3:21-cv-00082-DPM pursuant to #13 Order. (jak)
July 26, 2021 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Steven L. Bloch re #7 Order. (fjg)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: The Court has received the attached letter from counsel. Motion granted. All deadlines in this case are stayed, too. All substantive communications with the Court should be filed on the docket to complete our record. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/22/2021. (jak)
July 15, 2021 Filing 10 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #9 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: The Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. because he is presiding over a related case, Wilson v. Walmart, Case No. 3:21-cv-82-DPM. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/15/2021. (jak)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Tiffany Neal, Felicia Dykes, Melissa Dinovi, Vito Scarola, Anthony Harrison, Galena Gutierrez, Baylee Schaefer, Brandi Coleman, Dominick Grossi. Walmart Inc served on 6/28/2021. (Bates, Joseph)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 , #3 , #4 , #5 , and #6 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Timothy J. Peter, Steven L. Bloch, Ian W. Sloss, Joseph P. Guglielmo, and Erin Green Comite are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co- counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 6/30/2021. (jak)
June 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Erin Green Comite. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4042492. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph)
June 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joseph P. Guglielmo. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4042488. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bates, Joseph)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Ian W. Sloss. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4042486. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Steven L. Bloch. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4042474. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Timothy J. Peter. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4042064. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Bates, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc filed by Tiffany Neal, Felicia Dykes, Melissa Dinovi, Vito Scarola, Anthony Harrison, Galena Gutierrez, Baylee Schaefer, Brandi Coleman, Dominick Grossi. (Filing Fee of $402 paid, Receipt Number LIT082605.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman et al v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vito Scarola
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Dinovi
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tiffany Neal
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baylee Schaefer
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Harrison
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galena Gutierrez
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominick Grossi
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Coleman
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Dykes
Represented By: Zachary Rynar
Represented By: Ian W. Sloss
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Sean T. Masson
Represented By: Steven L. Bloch
Represented By: Erin G. Comite
Represented By: Tiffany M. Wyatt Oldham
Represented By: Joseph P. Guglielmo
Represented By: Timothy J. Peter
Represented By: Erin Green Comite
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?