Pacific Life Insurance Company v. Blevins
Plaintiff: Pacific Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Katie Blevins
Case Number: 3:2021cv00143
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Pacific Life Insurance Company.(Butler, Thomas)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER:Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 11/1/2021; Rule 26(f) Report due by 11/15/2021. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 9/12/2022 at 9:15 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) # 324 before Judge James M. Moody Jr.Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 and #6 motions to admit counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, Pacific Life Insurance Company. Thomas J. Butler and Joshua R. Hess are hereby admitted to appear before this Court as co-counsel of record in this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 08/26/2021. (llg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Joshua R. Hess. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4084036. Filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company (Waddell, Paul)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Thomas J. Butler. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4084029. Filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company (Waddell, Paul)
August 23, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jim Lyons on behalf of Katie Blevins (Lyons, Jim)
August 23, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against Pacific Life Insurance Company by Katie Blevins.(Lyons, Jim)
August 3, 2021 Summons Issued as to Katie Blevins. Returned to Plaintiff's counsel for service. (jak)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company. (wbb)
July 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Katie Blevins filed by Pacific Life Insurance Company. Fee $402; Receipt No. JON000976. Summons not issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Life Insurance Company v. Blevins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul D. Waddell
Represented By: Sam Waddell
Represented By: Joshua Robert Hess
Represented By: Thomas J. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katie Blevins
Represented By: Jim Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?