Moore v. Franks et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Bernard Moore
Defendant: Steve Franks, Brent Cox, J Trowbridge, K Jhonson, T Huggins, T Glenn, W Gibson and Anthony Carter
Case Number: 3:2021cv00177
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand Cox's Answer to Complaint and any Amended Complaint by Brent Cox.(Jones, Jamie Marie)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Frederick Bernard Moore re #8 Order. (fjg)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Mr. Moore to notify the Court of his current address within 30 days, if he wants to pursue the claims he raises in this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 9/30/2021. (kdr)
September 30, 2021 Filing 7 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Frederick Bernard Moore re #6 Order adopting #5 partial recommendation. (fjg)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER adopting #5 partial recommendation. Moore's procedural due process claim against Gibson is dismissed without prejudice. His deliberate indifference claims against Franks, Cox, Trowbridge, Jhonson, Huggins, Glenn, and Carter go forward. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/24/2021. (jak)
August 31, 2021 Filing 5 PARTIAL RECOMMENEDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Moore's procedural due process claim against Defendant Gibson be dismissed, without prejudice. Defendant Gibson should be terminated as a party defendant. Objections due 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 8/31/2021. (jak)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Franks, Cox, Trowbridge, Jhonson, Huggins, Glenn, and Carter. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve each of these defendants with a summons, complaint, and copy of this Order without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 8/31/2021. (jak)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will assess an initial partial filing payment of $3.00. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the initial payment immediately and forward future monthly payments from his prison trust account to the Clerk of Court until the entire $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Ouachita River Unit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 8/31/2021. (jak)
August 31, 2021 Summons Issued as to Anthony Carter, Brent Cox, Steve Franks, T Glenn, T Huggins, K Jhonson, J Trowbridge and forwarded to USMS for service. (ajt)
August 24, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Frederick Bernard Moore.(kdr)
August 24, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frederick Bernard Moore. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Franks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Bernard Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Cox
Represented By: Jamie Marie Huffman Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Trowbridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K Jhonson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?