Abbott et al v. Walmart Inc
Plaintiff: Rebecca Abbott, Meagan Albert, Sophia Alfaro, Krystal Leigh Anderson, Megan Ashley, Kimberly Azeneth Avila, Alyssa Megan Barb, Miriah Barbero, Lindsay Barr, Grisel Barreto, Ashley Baxter, Julie Blakeley, Kelsey Blankenship, Melissa Bloomquist-Smith, Cristen Boles, Olivia Boyer, Crystal Brinig, Nicole Brisky, Cheyenne Browning, Celia Bruno, Ana Butkus, Maria Calderon, Jordan Cantafio, Serenitey Carlin, Samantha Clark, Victoria Coker, Jen Comeau, Kimberly Conway, Adrianne Cooper, Angela Cox, Brandy Davis, Kaley Deford, Chelzy Desvigne, Brittany Distaso, Jessica Durrett, Natalya Dzyuba, Theresa Fintonis, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Marcela Garcia, Shelby Geraci, Christina Gordon, Gabrielle Harrison, Debbie Hawkins, Shannon Herrington, Amanda Hill, Lillian Hinkle, Nicole Holling, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Sammi Hobdy, Shaylan Isaacs, Olivia Johnson, Rebecca Keeton, Rachel Knudson, Rachael Kruup, Deana Linegar, April Lockhart, Traci Marie Lussier, Brittany Martin, Kali McGlinch, Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Renee Milline, Loukevia Moore, Andrea Mozo, Tabitha Mullinax, Santequia Ngwu, Stephanie Norgaard, Leah Ostapchenko, Robert Partello, Melinda Pass, Krishna Patel, Jo-Ellen Paterno, Sheetal Pattni, Mia Pelletier, Tina Marie Perez, Ali Pliler-Lopez, Janinne Price, Sarah Ridings, Kassandra Romero, Christina Salyers, Lea Santos, Kirthi Sasikumar, Julie Secrist, Cheryl Elaine Smith, Kinder Smith, Emily Soderbloom-Cathey, Kirsten South, Lakrisha Spikes, Christine Steele, Ashley Swenningson, Kyla Talley, Margo Tezeno, Katrina Thomas, Rhianna Thornton, Emma Trolinder, Megan Troyer, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Brittany Wallace, Beverly Watkins, Jennifer Kay Watts, Acacia Wilson, Amber Wright, Retrena Younge and Theresa Marie Fintonis
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Case Number: 3:2021cv00188
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: Brian S Miller
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Cases associated. Create association to 3:21-cv-00082-DPM pursuant to 31 Order in case 3:21-cv-00082 DPM. (jak)
October 4, 2021 Filing 4 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Pursuant to #3 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. (jak)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER pursuant to General Order 39, the Clerk is directed to reassign this case to Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. because it is related to case number 3:21-cv-00082 DPM. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/4/2021. (jak)
September 20, 2021 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Kassandra Romero, April Lockhart, Megan Ashley, Gabrielle Harrison, Cristen Boles, Sarah Ridings, Kimberly Azeneth Avila, Leah Ostapchenko, Stephanie Norgaard, Ali Pliler-Lopez, Mia Pelletier, Krishna Patel, Krystal Leigh Anderson, Shaylan Isaacs, Chelzy Desvigne, Kelsey Blankenship, Kyla Talley, Andrea Mozo, Nicole Holling, Christina Gordon, Brandy Davis, Alyssa Megan Barb, Sophia Alfaro, Rachael Kruup, Cheyenne Browning, Retrena Younge, Christine Steele, Robert Partello, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Maria Calderon, Amanda Hill, Megan Troyer, Rachel Knudson, Kali McGlinch, Kirthi Sasikumar, Lillian Hinkle, Lindsay Barr, Christina Salyers, Debbie Hawkins, Crystal Brinig, Kirsten South, Julie Blakeley, Tabitha Mullinax, Melissa Bloomquist-Smith, Ana Butkus, Olivia Boyer, Nicole Brisky, Loukevia Moore, Tina Marie Perez, Renee Milline, Sammi Hobdy, Melinda Pass, Lea Santos, Rebecca Abbott, Brittany Distaso, Amber Wright, Serenitey Carlin, Kimberly Conway, Cheryl Elaine Smith, Adrianne Cooper, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Rhianna Thornton, Brittany Martin, Kaley Deford, Emma Trolinder, Janinne Price, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Sheetal Pattni, Kinder Smith, Acacia Wilson, Marcela Garcia, Jennifer Kay Watts, Deana Linegar, Jen Comeau, Theresa Marie Fintonis, Ashley Swenningson, Beverly Watkins, Samantha Clark, Traci Marie Lussier, Katrina Thomas, Grisel Barreto, Celia Bruno, Victoria Coker, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Meagan Albert, Emily Soderbloom-Cathey, Olivia Johnson, Lakrisha Spikes, Brittany Wallace, Miriah Barbero, Santequia Ngwu, Angela Cox, Jordan Cantafio, Ashley Baxter, Natalya Dzyuba, Margo Tezeno, Jo-Ellen Paterno, Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry, Julie Secrist, Shannon Herrington, Rebecca Keeton, Shelby Geraci, Jessica Durrett. Walmart Inc served on 9/17/2021. (Bates, Joseph)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc filed by All Plaintiffs. (Fee $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT083629.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ajt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abbott et al v. Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Abbott
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meagan Albert
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophia Alfaro
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krystal Leigh Anderson
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Ashley
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Azeneth Avila
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alyssa Megan Barb
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miriah Barbero
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindsay Barr
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grisel Barreto
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Baxter
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Blakeley
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsey Blankenship
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Bloomquist-Smith
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cristen Boles
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Boyer
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Brinig
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Brisky
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheyenne Browning
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celia Bruno
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Butkus
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Calderon
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Cantafio
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serenitey Carlin
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Clark
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Coker
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jen Comeau
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Conway
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrianne Cooper
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Cox
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Davis
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaley Deford
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chelzy Desvigne
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Distaso
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Durrett
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalya Dzyuba
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Fintonis
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ayame Tatiana Galassini
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcela Garcia
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelby Geraci
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Gordon
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle Harrison
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie Hawkins
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Herrington
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hill
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Hinkle
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Holling
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hobbs-Rogers
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammi Hobdy
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shaylan Isaacs
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Johnson
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Keeton
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Knudson
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachael Kruup
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Linegar
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Lockhart
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci Marie Lussier
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Martin
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kali McGlinch
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Milline
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loukevia Moore
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Mozo
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tabitha Mullinax
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santequia Ngwu
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Norgaard
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Ostapchenko
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Partello
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melinda Pass
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krishna Patel
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo-Ellen Paterno
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheetal Pattni
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mia Pelletier
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Marie Perez
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ali Pliler-Lopez
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janinne Price
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Ridings
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kassandra Romero
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Salyers
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lea Santos
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirthi Sasikumar
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Secrist
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Elaine Smith
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kinder Smith
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Soderbloom-Cathey
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten South
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lakrisha Spikes
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Steele
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Swenningson
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyla Talley
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margo Tezeno
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katrina Thomas
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhianna Thornton
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emma Trolinder
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Troyer
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonja Renee Twiggs
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Wallace
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Watkins
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Kay Watts
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acacia Wilson
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Wright
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Retrena Younge
Represented By: Aaron M. Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa Marie Fintonis
Represented By: Aaron Michael Zigler
Represented By: Joseph Henry (Hank) Bates, III
Represented By: Steve Telken
Represented By: Troy E. Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?