Gibson v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Dornal Gibson
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2021cv00198
Filed: September 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dornal Gibson. Social Security Administration served on 11/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Executed Affidavits of Mailing)(Olinsky, Howard)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Gibson's counsel is directed to prepare summonses to be issued by the Clerk of Court, and to serve the complaint upon the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 9/23/2021. (jak)
September 23, 2021 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Dornal Gibson against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)
September 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Dornal Gibson. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dornal Gibson
Represented By: Howard David Olinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?