Collingsworth v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Collingsworth
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company, American Industrial Transport Inc and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00205
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.(Wolfe, Anna)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Daniel Collingsworth. American Industrial Transport Inc served on 11/10/2021. (Lacy, Brandon)
November 10, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Wolfe on behalf of Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company (Wolfe, Anna)
November 9, 2021 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company by Daniel Collingsworth. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Daniel Collingsworth. Fee $402; Receipt No. LIT083994. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Collingsworth v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Collingsworth
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Industrial Transport Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Anna Wolfe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?