Woodson v. Gladden et al
Plaintiff: Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr
Defendant: Gladden, Petty, Audrey Luff and Carter
Case Number: 3:2021cv00224
Filed: October 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Petty served on 11/17/2021. (kth)
December 1, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Gladden served on 11/17/2021. (kth)
December 1, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Gladden, Petty.(Dugger, Melissa)
December 1, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Dugger on behalf of Gladden, Petty (Dugger, Melissa)
November 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Carter served on 11/8/2021. (fjg)
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Audrey Luff served on 11/8/2021. (fjg)
November 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr. (ldb)
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE by Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr. (ldb)
October 29, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Order. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (wrong image file). The correct document was added to docket entry #4 and is attached hereto for service on the parties. (jak)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Gladden, Petty, Luff, and Carter. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve each of the defendants with a summons and a copy of the #2 Complaint including any attachments without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/28/2021. (jak) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/29/2021: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk of Court to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Mississippi County Detention Facility and appropriate ADC offices. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 10/28/2021. (kdr)
October 28, 2021 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
October 22, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr.(kdr)
October 22, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodson v. Gladden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Anthony Woodson, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gladden
Represented By: Melissa Dugger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petty
Represented By: Melissa Dugger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey Luff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?