Hamilton v. Hall
Plaintiff: Houston L Hamilton
Defendant: Matt Hall
Case Number: 3:2021cv00225
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Referring Judge: J Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2021 Filing 7 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Houston L Hamilton. (kdr)
November 29, 2021 Filing 6 RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION that Hamilton's deliberate indifference claim against Hall be DISMISSED, WITHOUT PREJUDICE, for failure to state a viable 1983 claim. Objections due within 14 days of Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/29/2021. (csf)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Status. The Clerk is directed to send Hamilton an updated copy of the docket sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/23/2021. (jak)
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS granting #1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect monthly payments from his institutional account and forward to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Poinsett County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 11/22/2021. (jak)
November 22, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Status by Houston L Hamilton. (llg)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Matt Hall, filed by Houston L Hamilton.(kdr)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Houston L Hamilton. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Houston L Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?