Stevens v. Craighead County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Tony Joe Stevens
Defendant: Craighead County Jail, West, Ballard, Zachary West and Mark Ballard
Case Number: 3:2021cv00255
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER directing Mr. Stevens if he wants to pursue the claims he raises in this lawsuit, he must notify the Court of his current address within 30 days. Failure to comply with this Order may result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 2/9/2022. (jak)
February 8, 2022 Filing 18 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Tony Joe Stevens re #10 Response. (jbh)
February 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: If Defendants intend to pursue a defense, pursuant to the Prison Litigation Reform Act, that Plaintiff failed to exhaust his administrative remedies before filing this lawsuit, they must raise the issue in a motion for summary judgment filed no later than March 21, 2022. All discovery is stayed until the Court resolves any exhaustion issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 2/7/2022. (jak)
February 2, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Mark Ballard, Zachary West.(Thomas, JaNan)
February 2, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Mark Ballard, Zachary West (Thomas, JaNan)
January 21, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Mark Ballard served on 1/12/2022. (kth)
January 21, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Zachary West served on 1/12/2022. (kth)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER adopting #6 partial recommendation. Stevens's excessive force claims against Zachary West and Mark Ballard will proceed. Doc. #5 at 1. His verbal harassment claim against West and his claims against the Craighead County jail are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2022. (jak)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER directing the Clerk to update the docket sheet to reflect the full names of Defendants Ballard and West - Mark Ballard and Zachary West; directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Mark Ballard and Zachary West; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve these Defendants with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 1/5/2022. (jbh)
January 5, 2022 Summons Reissued as to Mark Ballard, Zachary West and forwarded to the U.S. Marshal for service. (jbh)
January 4, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE by defendants re #9 Order (tjb)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER directing the Clerk to provide a copy of this Order to Ms. Thomas, Association of Arkansas Counties and the Warden of the Craighead County Jail. Counsel for Craighead County is directed to provide the Court a list of employees with the last name of Ballard or West who were employed by the County Jail on 11/18/2021 within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/20/2021. (jak)
December 17, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to West. (kth)
December 17, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Ballard. (kth)
December 14, 2021 Filing 6 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that plaintiff's verbal harassment claim against Defendant West and his claims against the County Jail be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to state a constitutional claim; and the Clerk be instructed to terminate the County Jail as a party Defendant. Objections due 14 days from the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/14/2021. (jak)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summonses for Defendants West and Ballard. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these defendants with a summons and a copy of the #2 Complaint, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. #3 Motion to preserve video footage is granted. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the Craighead County Jail reminding him or her of the duty to preserve all evidence that may be relevant to the issues in this lawsuit, including video footage of the 11/18/2021 incident involving Mr. Stevens. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/14/2021. (jak)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS. Granting #1 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the $350 filing fee be deducting monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account and forwarding them to the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Greene County Detention Facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/14/2021. (jak)
December 14, 2021 Summons Issued as to Ballard, West and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
December 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Preserve Security Video for Evidence by Tony Joe Stevens. (llg)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Tony Joe Stevens. (llg)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tony Joe Stevens. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Craighead County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Joe Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craighead County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ballard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zachary West
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ballard
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?