Mashburn v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Curtis Mashburn
Defendant: Steven Davis, Sonya Wiles, Mark Counts and Darrell Elkin
Case Number: 3:2021cv00257
Filed: December 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Northern Division Office
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Referring Judge: Edie R Ervin
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2022 Filing 17 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #14 Order. (fjg)
January 21, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Steven Davis.(Thomas, JaNan)
January 21, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Steven Davis (Thomas, JaNan)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER directing Mr. Mashburn to notify the Court of his current address within 30 days if he wants to pursue the claims he raises in this lawsuit. Failure to comply with this Order is likely to result in the dismissal of this lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 1/11/2022. (jak)
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #4 Partial Recommended Disposition. (jbh)
January 10, 2022 Filing 12 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #7 Order. (jbh)
January 5, 2022 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Steven Davis served on 12/31/2021. (kth)
December 30, 2021 Filing 10 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #5 Order. (fjg)
December 29, 2021 Filing 9 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #2 Complaint. (fjg)
December 28, 2021 Filing 8 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #3 Initial Order for Pro Se Prisoner-Plaintiffs. (fjg)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER instructing the Clerk to mail another copy of docket entry #4 to Mr. Mashburn at the Sharp County Detention Center; directing the mailroom officer of the Sharp County Detention Center to notate if Mr. Mashburn has been released from custody when returning Mr. Mashburn's mail to the Court; and instructing the Clerk to provide the Warden/Director of the Sharp County Detention Center a copy of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/28/2021. (llg)
December 23, 2021 Filing 6 Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Ronald Curtis Mashburn re #4 Partial Recommended Disposition. (cmn)
December 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Steven Davis and Sonya Wiles. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve these defendants with a summons and a copy of the #2 complaint, without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/20/2021. (jak)
December 20, 2021 Summons Issued as to Steven Davis, Sonya Wiles and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
December 16, 2021 Filing 4 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that with the exception of Mr. Mashburn's claims that Defendants Davis and Wiles were deliberately indifferent to his dental needs, all other claims be dismissed; and recommending that the Clerk be instructed to terminate Defendants Mark Counts and Darrell Elkin. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this Recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/16/2021. (ldb)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS granting #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court will assess an initial partial payment of $6.00. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the initial partial payment and forward that amount along with future monthly payments to the Clerk of Court until the entire $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Sharp County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 12/15/2021. (jak)
December 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ronald Curtis Mashburn. (llg)
December 13, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronald Curtis Mashburn. (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mashburn v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Curtis Mashburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Davis
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonya Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Counts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrell Elkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?