Williams v. Hibbett Inc et al
Plaintiff: Latasha Williams
Defendant: Hibbett Inc, Hibbett Retail Inc, Hibbett Wholesale Inc, Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc, Hibbett Sports Inc, Jason Stricker, Wynne Arkansas, City of, Wynne Arkansas Police Department, Jackie Clark, Anthony Dale Parker, Steven Hallmark and Amber Jefferson
Case Number: 3:2022cv00002
Filed: January 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2022 Filing 23 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #22 Motion to Dismiss Party filed by Wynne Arkansas Police Department. (Monaghan, Sara)
March 1, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Party by Wynne Arkansas Police Department (Monaghan, Sara)
March 1, 2022 Filing 21 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Jackie Clark, Steven Hallmark, Anthony Dale Parker, Wynne Arkansas Police Department, Wynne Arkansas, City of.(Monaghan, Sara)
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Sara Monaghan on behalf of Jackie Clark, Steven Hallmark, Anthony Dale Parker, Wynne Arkansas Police Department, Wynne Arkansas, City of (Monaghan, Sara)
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Joint motion, Doc. #18 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 21 March 2022. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/1/2022. (slb)
February 28, 2022 Filing 18 Joint MOTION to Extend Time for Defendant's Responsive Pleadings by Hibbett Inc, Hibbett Retail Inc, Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc, Hibbett Sports Inc, Hibbett Wholesale Inc, Amber Jefferson, Jason Stricker (Holmes, Rodrick)
February 22, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #11 Affidavit of Service. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the service date to 2/10/2022 as indicated on the document. (kbc)
February 21, 2022 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Latasha Williams. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Latasha Williams. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Latasha Williams. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Latasha Williams. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service Hibbett Inc., filed by Latasha Williams. Hibbett Inc served on 2/14/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service Steven Hallmark, filed by Latasha Williams. Steven Hallmark served on 2/11/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service City of Wynne, Arkansas Police Department, filed by Latasha Williams. Wynne Arkansas Police Department served on 2/10/2022. (Smith, Dusty) Docket text modified on 2/22/2022 to correct date of service. (kbc)
February 21, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service Jason Stricker, filed by Latasha Williams. Jason Stricker served on 2/10/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service City of Wynne, Arkansas, filed by Latasha Williams. Wynne Arkansas, City of served on 2/10/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service Jackie Clark, filed by Latasha Williams. Jackie Clark served on 2/9/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service Amber Jefferson, filed by Latasha Williams. Amber Jefferson served on 2/9/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service Hibbett Wholesale, Inc., filed by Latasha Williams. Hibbett Wholesale Inc served on 2/7/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service Hibbett Sporting Goods, Inc., filed by Latasha Williams. Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc served on 2/7/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service Hibbett Retail, Inc., filed by Latasha Williams. Hibbett Retail Inc served on 2/7/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
February 21, 2022 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Anthony Dale Parker, filed by Latasha Williams. Anthony Dale Parker served on 2/3/2022. (Smith, Dusty)
January 13, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #2 Amended Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description as, "AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Latasha Williams." (cmn)
January 12, 2022 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Latasha Williams.(Byrd, John) (Docket text modified on 1/13/2022 to correct description.)(cmn)
January 5, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Latasha Williams against All Defendants. (Fee $ 402, Receipt Number LIT085107.) No summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hibbett Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latasha Williams
Represented By: John Paul Byrd
Represented By: Patrick Russell Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbett Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbett Retail Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbett Wholesale Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbett Sporting Goods Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hibbett Sports Inc
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Stricker
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynne Arkansas, City of
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wynne Arkansas Police Department
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackie Clark
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Dale Parker
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Hallmark
Represented By: Sara Monaghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amber Jefferson
Represented By: Rodrick D. Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?