Wolverton v. Mazda Motor of America Inc
Plaintiff: Andrea Wolverton
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America Inc
Case Number: 3:2022cv00013
Filed: January 19, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Ann Rogers on behalf of Mazda Motor of America Inc (Rogers, Jennifer)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Ayers on behalf of Mazda Motor of America Inc (Ayers, David)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 , #8 motions for admission pro hac vice of attorneys David L. Ayers and Jennifer A. Rogers. Mr. Ayers and Ms. Rogers will appear as counsel of record for defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc. along with Mazda's Arkansas counsel. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/31/2022. (jbh)
January 27, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Jennifer A. Rogers. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4193148. Filed by Mazda Motor of America Inc (Lowther, Edwin)
January 27, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by David L. Ayers. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4193125. Filed by Mazda Motor of America Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lowther, Edwin)
January 24, 2022 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mazda Motor of America Inc. (Lowther, Edwin)
January 19, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Mazda Motor of America Inc (Lowther, Edwin)
January 19, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand /Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant by Mazda Motor of America, Inc. d/b/a Mazda North American Operations by Mazda Motor of America Inc.(Lowther, Edwin)
January 19, 2022 Filing 3 INTERROGATORIES and REQUEST for Production of Documents by Andrea Wolverton. (jbh)
January 19, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Mazda Motor of America Inc, filed by Andrea Wolverton. (jbh)
January 19, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mazda Motor of America Inc from Fulton County Circuit Court, case number 25CV-21-00054. Fee of $402 paid; receipt number LIT085280. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wolverton v. Mazda Motor of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Wolverton
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mazda Motor of America Inc
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Zachary R. Trail
Represented By: David L. Ayers
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?