Lucas v. Case et al
Plaintiff: William M Lucas
Defendant: Robert Case, Bailey Burns, Mandi Quinn and Greene County Detention Center
Case Number: 3:2022cv00050
Filed: February 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Edie R Ervin
Referring Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2022 Filing 18 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Mandi Quinn. (fjg)
April 12, 2022 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Robert Case served on 3/29/2022. (kth)
April 12, 2022 Filing 16 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Robert Case.(Thomas, JaNan)
April 12, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by JaNan Arnold Thomas on behalf of Robert Case (Thomas, JaNan)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting #9 Partial Recommendation as this Court's findings in all respects. Mr. Lucas' claims against the Greene County Detention Center are dismissed, with prejudice. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the Greene County Detention Center as a party defendant. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 3/28/2022. (jak)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying #12 motion for counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 3/24/2022. (kdr)
March 22, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by William M Lucas. (kdr)
March 22, 2022 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #9 Report and Recommendations by William M Lucas. (kdr)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 IFP motion. The Court will assess an initial partial filing fee of $106.30. Plaintiff's custodians are directed to collect the partial payment immediately and forward future monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account to the Clerk of Court until a total of $350 has been paid. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this Order to the ADC Trust Fund Centralized Banking Office, the ADC Compliance Division, and the Warden of the Greene County Detention Center. The Clerk of Court is directed to prepare summonses for Defendants Case, Burns, and Quinn. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve those Defendants with summonses and a copy of the #1 Complaint and #6 addendum to the complaint with any attachments without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 3/10/2022. (jak)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 PARTIAL RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that Mr. Lucas' claims against the Detention Center be dismissed, without prejudice, based on his failure to state a constitutional claim and the Clerk be instructed to terminate the Detention Center as a party Defendant. Objections due 14 days from the date of this recommendation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 3/10/2022. (jak)
March 10, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William M Lucas. (llg)
March 10, 2022 Summons Issued as to Bailey Burns, Robert Case, Mandi Quinn and forwarded to U.S. Marshal for service. (ldb)
March 7, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #6 Addendum. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (lack of case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #6 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
March 7, 2022 Filing 6 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by William M Lucas. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/7/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
March 2, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and #2 Complaint. CORRECTION: The original documents were attached in error (incomplete image files) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct documents were added to docket entries #1 and #2 and are attached hereto for review by the parties. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(jak)
March 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONER-PLAINTIFFS denying #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a new IFP application along with a copy of this Order. Within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff must return a completed IFP application, including an accompanying affidavit and jail account information sheet, or pay the $402.00 filing fee. If you fail to do so, the lawsuit will be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edie R. Ervin on 3/2/2022. (jak)
February 28, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Production of Documents by William M Lucas.(kdr)
February 28, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by William M Lucas.(kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak)
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William M Lucas. (kdr) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/2/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucas v. Case et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William M Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Case
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bailey Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandi Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?