Thompson v. Rector School District
Plaintiff: Nicholas Thompson
Defendant: Rector School District
Case Number: 3:2022cv00062
Filed: March 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2022 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 6/8/2022. Jury Trial set for 4/8/2024 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom #324 before Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 4/19/2022. (slb)
April 18, 2022 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Rector School District.(Worsham, Rebecca)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Worsham on behalf of Rector School District (Worsham, Rebecca)
March 31, 2022 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nicholas Thompson. Rector School District served on 3/28/2022. (Gates, Joseph)
March 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Nicholas Thompson against Rector School District. (Fee $402, Receipt Number LIT085931.) Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ldb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Rector School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Thompson
Represented By: Joseph D. Gates
Represented By: Joshua D. Gillispie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rector School District
Represented By: Rebecca Worsham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?