Austin v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Jenny Austin
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2022cv00100
Filed: April 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 Review of HHS Decision
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 24, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jenny Austin. Social Security Administration served on 5/9/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wallace, Stephanie)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Moss on behalf of Social Security Administration (Moss, Michael)
April 25, 2022 Filing 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/25/2022. (jak)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff may proceed without prepayment of fees and costs or security therefor. The Clerk is directed to issue summons to counsel for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 04/15/2022. (get)
April 15, 2022 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT filed by Jenny Austin against Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(wbb)
April 14, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jenny Austin. (wbb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Austin v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Austin
Represented By: Stephanie Bartels Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Represented By: Michael A. Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?