Snyder v. Rowland et al
Plaintiff: Cardarylo Snyder and Cardarylo J Snyder
Defendant: Felicia Rowland and Does Greene County Detention Center Staff
Case Number: 3:2022cv00181
Filed: July 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Jerome T Kearney
Referring Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's custodian is directed to collect an initial partial filing fee of $34.34 and forward that amount along with future monthly payments from plaintiff's prison trust account to the Clerk of Court until the total $350 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk shall forward a copy of this Order to the Administrator of the Greene County Detention Center. If Plaintiff wishes to submit a Second Amended Complaint he shall file it within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mail plaintiff a blank 1983 complaint form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/8/2022. (jak)
September 6, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cardarylo J Snyder. (wbb)
August 3, 2022 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cardarylo J Snyder. (wbb)
August 2, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Order. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the file date as 8/1/2022 as marked on the Order. (jak)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff must submit either the $402 statutory filing fee, or a complete affidavit in support of his IFP motion, within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send to plaintiff an IFP application. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 8/2/2022. (jak) (Docket entry modified on 8/2/2022 to correct the file date) (jak)
August 1, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Cardarylo J Snyder. (wbb)
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER directing plaintiff to either submit the $402 statutory filing fee or an in forma pauperis motion within 30 days of the entry date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to send to plaintiff an IFP motion, together with the filing fee calculation sheet. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/19/2022. (jak)
July 18, 2022 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text as modified to correct the party as "Cardarylo J Snyder" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
July 15, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Cardarylo J Snyder. (llg) (Docket text modified on 7/18/2022 to correct party name.)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snyder v. Rowland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardarylo Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cardarylo J Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Rowland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Greene County Detention Center Staff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?