Nixon v. Does
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Defendant: Does
Case Number: 3:2022cv00282
Filed: November 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: D P Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE by Ronnie J Nixon. (jbh)
December 29, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronnie J Nixon. (cmn)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER of USCA as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie J Nixon: Appellant may not proceed in this appeal without first paying the full appellate docketing fee. Appellant is directed to pay to the Clerk of the United States District Court the appellate docketing fee of $505, or to file a pleading in this court explaining why Appellant is eligible to proceed without pre-payment of the fee. If appellant fails to either pay the fee or respond to this order within 30 days of the date of this order, the appeal will be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Compliance is due 1/18/2023. (jbh)
December 19, 2022 Filing 29 USCA Docketing Letter as to 26 Notice of Appeal filed by Ronnie J Nixon. USCA Case Number 22-3610. (jbh)
December 19, 2022 Filing 28 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 26 Notice of Appeal re #8 Order, #9 Judgment. (jbh)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #13 motion for copies as modified; directing the Clerk to send Nixon a copy of the docket sheet in this case; denying #16 motion for copies without prejudice; denying #20 motion for service; and denying #25 motion for leave to appeal in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/19/2022. (jbh)
December 13, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #8 Order and #9 Judgment, filed by Ronnie J Nixon. (No separate document filed; see docket entry #25 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis.) (fcd)
December 13, 2022 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Ronnie J Nixon. (fcd)
December 8, 2022 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Prisoner Account and Calculation Sheet by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 23 SUPPLEMENT to re #20 MOTION for Service, by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 22 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #18 Notice of Change of Address. CORRECTION: The original document was attached in error (incorrect Judge initials in the case number) due to a clerical mistake by the Clerk's office. The correct document was added to docket entry #18 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
December 8, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 20 MOTION for Service by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 19 WITNESS LIST by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/8/2022: #1 Main Document - Correct) (jak).
December 7, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE by Ronnie J Nixon. (llg)
December 7, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION for Order by Ronnie J Nixon. (llg)
December 5, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE to the Court by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
December 5, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE to the Court by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
December 5, 2022 Filing 13 MOTION for Copies by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 motion; and directing the Clerk to send Nixon copies of the docket sheet and Doc. #2 , #5 , and #7 . Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2022. (jbh)
November 30, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Copies by Ronnie J Nixon. (ldb)
November 21, 2022 Filing 10 APPELLATE FILING FEE NOTICE to Plaintiff. (jak)
November 21, 2022 Filing 9 JUDGMENT: Nixon's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/21/2022. (jak)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #1 motion to proceed in forma pauperis and plaintiff's complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Nixon's #6 motion is also denied. If Nixon wants to pursue this case, then he must pay $402 and file a motion to reopen the case by 12/19/2022. An in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and accompanying Judgmnet will not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/21/2022. (jak)
November 14, 2022 Filing 7 ADDENDUM to #2 Complaint filed by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
November 14, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Order by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
November 14, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE to the Court by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)
November 14, 2022 Filing 4 Witness List by Ronnie J Nixon.(kdr)
November 9, 2022 Filing 3 REQUEST for Production of Documents by Ronnie J Nixon.(kdr)
November 1, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Does, filed by Ronnie J Nixon.(kdr)
November 1, 2022 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronnie J Nixon. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nixon v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie J Nixon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?