Devazier v. The Springs Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Brittney Ann Devazier
Defendant: Springs Arkansas, Batesville Healthcare LLC doing business as The Springs Batesville, Batesville Realty Holdings LLC, Wellspring Healthcare LLC, Synergy Staffing LLC, Wellstone Group LLC, CASA Healthcare LLC, Wellstone Batesville Management LLC, Jacob Taub, Isaac Gutman, Chaim Herzberg, Alexander Hoffman, John Doe, The Springs Arkansas, Batesville Healthcare LLC doing business as Springs Batesville, The Wellstone Group LLC and The Springs Arkansas LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00075
Filed: March 27, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Kristine G Baker
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601 Violation of the Family and Medical Leave Act-1993
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Jacob Taub served on 5/19/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
May 19, 2023 Filing 25 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Summons issued for The Springs Arkansas LLC and returned to counsel for service. (wbb)
May 11, 2023 Filing 24 NOTICE by Brittney Ann Devazier Notice of Dismissal and Consent Motion to Dismiss (Moore, Barrett)
May 10, 2023 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Batesville Healthcare LLC, Batesville Realty Holdings LLC, CASA Healthcare LLC, Isaac Gutman, Chaim Herzberg, Alexander Hoffman, Jacob Taub, The Springs Arkansas, The Wellstone Group LLC, Wellspring Healthcare LLC, Wellstone Batesville Management LLC.(Kaemmerling, Michelle)
May 4, 2023 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Chaim Herzberg served on 4/19/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #17 motion to extend time to file responsive pleading. Separate defendants have until 5/15/2023, to file their responsive pleadings. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/24/2023. (jbh)
April 20, 2023 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Batesville Healthcare LLC, Batesville Realty Holdings LLC, CASA Healthcare LLC, The Springs Arkansas, The Wellstone Group LLC, Wellspring Healthcare LLC, Wellstone Batesville Management LLC (Jones, Daveante)
April 20, 2023 Filing 19 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court re #17 Motion notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
April 19, 2023 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Daveante Jones on behalf of Batesville Healthcare LLC, Batesville Realty Holdings LLC, CASA Healthcare LLC, Isaac Gutman, Chaim Herzberg, Alexander Hoffman, Jacob Taub, The Springs Arkansas, The Wellstone Group LLC, Wellspring Healthcare LLC, Wellstone Batesville Management LLC (Jones, Daveante)
April 19, 2023 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Batesville Healthcare LLC, Batesville Realty Holdings LLC, CASA Healthcare LLC, Isaac Gutman, Chaim Herzberg, Alexander Hoffman, Jacob Taub, The Springs Arkansas, The Wellstone Group LLC, Wellspring Healthcare LLC, Wellstone Batesville Management LLC (Kaemmerling, Michelle)
April 19, 2023 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Synergy Staffing LLC (Bronson, Vicki)
April 18, 2023 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brittney Ann Devazier as to Wellstone Batesville Management LLC. (Moore, Barrett)
April 18, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brittney Ann Devazier as to The Wellstone Group LLC. (Moore, Barrett)
April 18, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brittney Ann Devazier as to Jacob Taub. (Moore, Barrett)
April 18, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Brittney Ann Devazier as to CASA Healthcare LLC. (Moore, Barrett)
April 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion. Synergy has until 5/15/2023 to file its answer or other responsive pleading in this case. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 4/18/2023. (jak)
April 18, 2023 Filing 10 Deficiency Letter re #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer notifying party that a Corporate Disclosure Statement was not filed with first appearance, pleading, petition, motion response, or other request (F.R.Cv.P. 7.1). (jak)
April 17, 2023 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Synergy Staffing LLC (Bronson, Vicki)
April 17, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki Bronson on behalf of Synergy Staffing LLC (Bronson, Vicki)
April 13, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Springs Arkansas served on 3/30/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 13, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Alexander Hoffman served on 4/7/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 13, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Isaac Gutman served on 4/4/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 13, 2023 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Wellspring Healthcare LLC served on 3/31/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 13, 2023 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Batesville Realty Holdings LLC served on 4/5/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
April 13, 2023 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Brittney Ann Devazier. Batesville Healthcare LLC served on 4/5/2023. (Moore, Barrett)
March 27, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Brittney Ann Devazier. (Fee $402. Receipt Number JON140. Summons issued and returned to plaintiff's counsel for service) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devazier v. The Springs Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittney Ann Devazier
Represented By: Barrett Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springs Arkansas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesville Healthcare LLC doing business as The Springs Batesville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesville Realty Holdings LLC
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellspring Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Staffing LLC
Represented By: Vicki Bronson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellstone Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CASA Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellstone Batesville Management LLC
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Taub
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isaac Gutman
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaim Herzberg
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexander Hoffman
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Springs Arkansas
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Batesville Healthcare LLC doing business as Springs Batesville
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Wellstone Group LLC
Represented By: Daveante Jones
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Springs Arkansas LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?