Dunn et al v. Activision Blizzard Inc et al
Plaintiff: Casey Dunn and Thomas Dunn
Defendant: Activision Blizzard Inc, Infinity Ward Inc, Treyarch Corp, Sledgehammer Games Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Epic Games Inc, EA Digital Illusions, Electronic Arts Inc, Ubisoft Divertissements Inc doing business as Ubisoft Montreal, Ubisoft Entertainment, EA Digital Illusions CE AB doing business as DICE, Nintendo of America Inc, Google LLC and Does John and Jane I-XX
Case Number: 3:2023cv00224
Filed: October 30, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2023 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Waiver. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to correct the description as follows, "WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Epic Games Inc by Casey Dunn" as indicated by the document. (cmn)
December 14, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 Waivers of Service. CORRECTION: The original documents were submitted in error (editable image file format). The correct documents were added to docket entries #9 , #10 , #11 , and #12 based on the attached correspondence. (jak)
December 14, 2023 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Treyarch Corp by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/14/2023)) (jak).
December 14, 2023 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sledgehammer Games Inc by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/14/2023)) (jak).
December 14, 2023 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Infinity Ward Inc by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/14/2023)) (jak).
December 14, 2023 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Activision Blizzard Inc by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/14/2023: #1 Main Document - Correct (submitted 12/14/2023)) (jak).
December 13, 2023 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Nintendo of America Inc by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean)
December 12, 2023 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Microsoft Corporation by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Tina Bullock to Appear Pro Hac Vice; granting #4 Motion for Danielle Ward Mason to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 12/4/2023. (sjh)
December 1, 2023 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Epic Games Inc by Casey Dunn. (Walas, Breean) (Docket entry modified on 12/20/2023 to correct description.)(cmn)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Danielle Ward Mason. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4647647. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Walas, Breean)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Tina Bullock. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-4647642. Filed by All Plaintiffs (Walas, Breean)
November 3, 2023 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Thomas Dunn, Casey Dunn. (ajj)
November 3, 2023 Summons Issued to Activision Blizzard Inc, EA Digital Illusions CE AB, Epic Games Inc, Infinity Ward Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America Inc, Sledgehammer Games Inc, Treyarch Corp, Ubisoft Divertissements Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment and returned to counsel for service. (ajj)
October 31, 2023 Summons Issued to Activision Blizzard Inc, Infinity Ward Inc, Treyarch Corp, Sledgehammer Games Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Epic Games Inc, EA Digital Illusions, Ubisoft Divertissements Inc, Ubisoft Entertainment and returned to counsel for service. (fjg)
October 30, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants filed by Casey Dunn and Thomas Dunn. (Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT4097.) No summons issued. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (llg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn et al v. Activision Blizzard Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Dunn
Represented By: Breean Walas
Represented By: Danielle Ward Mason
Represented By: Leslie Pescia
Represented By: Rachel Minder
Represented By: Tina Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Dunn
Represented By: Breean Walas
Represented By: Danielle Ward Mason
Represented By: Leslie Pescia
Represented By: Rachel Minder
Represented By: Tina Bullock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activision Blizzard Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Infinity Ward Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Treyarch Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sledgehammer Games Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Epic Games Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Digital Illusions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Electronic Arts Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft Divertissements Inc doing business as Ubisoft Montreal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ubisoft Entertainment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EA Digital Illusions CE AB doing business as DICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Google LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does John and Jane I-XX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?