USA, et al v. Vertac Chemical Corp, et al

Plaintiff: Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Defendant: Vertac Chemical Corporation, Department of Defense, Dow Chemical Corporation, Chemtura Corporation, Velsicol Chemical Corporation and John Does
Cross_claimant: Vertac Chemical Corporation, Dow Chemical Company Inc, Hercules Inc, Dow Chemical Corporation and Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Cross_defendant: Hercules Inc, Vertac Chemical Corporation, United States of America, Dow Chemical Company Inc, Department of Defense, Standard Chlorine Chemical Company, Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc, Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd, Chemtura Corporation, Dow Chemical Corporation and Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Counter_claimant: Vertac Chemical Corporation, Hercules Inc, Dow Chemical Company Inc, Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd, Chemtura Corporation and Velsicol Chemical Corporation
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Vertac Chemical Corporation, Hercules Inc and Chemtura Corporation
Thirdparty_defendant: Dow Chemical Company Inc, Dow Chemical Corporation and Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Receiver: Lee S Thalheimer
Counter_defendant: United States of America, Department of Defense, Vertac Chemical Corporation, Hercules Inc, Dow Chemical Company Inc, Standard Chlorine Chemical Company, Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc, Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd and Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Case Number: 4:1980cv00109
Filed: March 4, 1980
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:6901
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 24, 2013 2673 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2638 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting 2669 Motion to Approve/Approval fees and expenses; granting 2671 Motion to Dissolve the Receivership; and denying as moot 2670 Motion to Dismiss. The Receiver shall file notice by Ju ly 2, 2013 that he has made all final payments directed in this Order. Effective upon the filing of that notice, the Court discharges the Receiver, releases his bond and surety (United States Fidelity and Guaranty Company), and terminates the Receivership. This case is closed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/24/13. (kpr)
May 8, 2013 2660 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to sign the settlement agreement and close the real estate transactions by May 31, 2013. The Court further orders the Receiver to file his final petition on all loose ends by June 11, 2013. The Receiver's appointment is extended to July 3, 2013. Any party who misses any of these ddls without seeking and getting prior Court approval must show why some sanction would not be appropriate. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/8/13. (kpr)
January 10, 2013 2631 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 2630 Memorandum regarding proof of publication. The Court approves it, with some supplements, as set forth in this Order; granting 2617 motion to approve donation of records; and, setting a hearing re: the amended proposed settlement agreement and to resolve pending motions for 3/27/13 at 10:30 a.m. The Receiver's appointment is extended from 4/30/13 to 5/31/13. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/13. (kpr) (Docket entry modified on 1/10/2013 to establish linkage and correct the ruling.) (thd).
August 15, 2012 2619 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescheduling September 19th hearing for Tuesday, September 18, 2012, at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/12. (kpr)
April 30, 2012 2595 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Receiver to submit a short supplemental report covering the issues set forth in this Order by May 11, 2012. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/30/12. (kpr)
January 27, 2012 2586 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 2583 Motion for Forfeiture of Property; denying 2584 Motion for Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/27/12. (kpr)
July 8, 2011 2574 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reappointing Lee A. Thalheimer's appointment as Receiver for Vertac, nunc pro tunc, for a term running from August 1, 2002 until July 31, 2012. All counsel must register with the CM-ECF system in the Eastern District of Arkansas, if they have not already done so, by July 31, 2011. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/8/11. (kpr)
December 23, 2008 2548 Opinion or Order of the Court SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, STIPULATED ORDER AND JUDGMENT, pursuant to 2547 Order, concerning Defendants Hercules Incorporated & Uniroyal Chemical Ltd. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/23/08. (jct)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA, et al v. Vertac Chemical Corp, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Barry M. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Velsicol Chemical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Dow Chemical Company Inc
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Hercules Inc
Represented By: V. Robert Denham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Hercules Inc
Represented By: Charles L. Schlumberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Gary S. Guzy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dow Chemical Company Inc
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Scott J. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Standard Chlorine Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd
Represented By: Thomas David Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Represented By: Charles L. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Hercules Inc
Represented By: V. Robert Denham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Dow Chemical Company Inc
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd
Represented By: Thomas David Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: Thomas David Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Velsicol Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Nathan Craig Culp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Hercules Inc
Represented By: V. Robert Denham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Chemtura Corporation
Represented By: Thomas David Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Dow Chemical Company Inc
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Dow Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Represented By: Richard F. Ricci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Lee S Thalheimer
Represented By: Richard L. Ramsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Sam Blesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Department of Defense
Represented By: Scott J. Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Vertac Chemical Corporation
Represented By: Robert R. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Hercules Inc
Represented By: V. Robert Denham, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Dow Chemical Company Inc
Represented By: Karl S. Bourdeau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Standard Chlorine Chemical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Standard Chlorine of Delaware Inc
Represented By: Samuel E. Ledbetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Uniroyal Chemical LTEE Ltd
Represented By: Thomas David Gillespie, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Represented By: Charles L. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Department of Pollution Control and Ecology
Represented By: Charles L. Moulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?