Allen v. Morris

Case Number: 4:1993cv00398
Filed: June 9, 1993
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
Referring Judge: Jerry W. Cavaneau
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 20, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pltf's 140 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/20/10. (vjt)
August 18, 2010 138 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor defts re 136 137 Jury Verdict. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 8/18/10. (bkp)
August 16, 2010 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion for Order; granting 129 Motion to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/16/10. (bkp)
August 11, 2010 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Bryan Hosto and John H. Allen to bring electronic devices into the Courthouse for the trial on 8/16/10. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/11/10. (vjt)
June 4, 2010 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 111 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting defts' request for dismissal of deft Larry Morris due to his death; granting 110 Motion to Amend/Correct and directing plaintiff to file his second amended complaint within seven days of entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/4/10. (bkp)
April 20, 2010 108 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing pltf to file a response on or before 4/26/10 to 105 Notice of Death, and Request for Dismissal of deft Larry Morris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 4/20/10. (vjt)
April 2, 2010 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 101 Partial Report and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 93 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Larry Morris, Monroe County, Arkansas. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/2/10. (bkp)
October 28, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 80 Partial Report and Recommendations granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Leave to File filed by John H Allen, and granting in part and denying in part 74 Motion to Strike filed by Larry Morris. Plaintiff is directed to file within five days of this order adopting the recommendations, an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/28/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?