Murphy v. Baptist Medcare Inc

Plaintiff: Misty Murphy
Defendant: Baptist Medcare Inc
Case Number: 4:2002cv00440
Filed: July 18, 2002
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Rodney S. Webb
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 20, 2008 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 150 Motion in Limine; granting 153 Motion in Limine ; the testimony of Dr. Lucy is excluded. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 11/20/08. (mkf)
November 25, 2008 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: General Order 54 of the Eastern District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 11/25/08. (mkf)
December 5, 2008 169 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL INSTRUCTION ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 12/5/08. (mkf)
December 22, 2008 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 171 Plaintiff's Motion for New Trial and to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Rodney S. Webb on 12/22/2008. (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Baptist Medcare Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Murphy
Represented By: Robert R. Cortinez, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baptist Medcare Inc
Represented By: Byron L. Freeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.