Mid-State Trust X v. Crowson

Case Number: 4:2003cv00485
Filed: June 23, 2003
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 8/29/12. (kpr) (Docket text modified on 8/29/2012 to correct the description of the document filed.) (thd).
May 17, 2012 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Approving Commissioner's Deed 17 . Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/17/12. (kpr)
March 14, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE: Plaintiff's shall have and recover judgment against Defendant Johnny Crowson and in rem against the Property, in the amount of $106,650.00. The Third-Party Complaint of Defendant Johnny Crowson is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 3/14/2012. (dmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-State Trust X v. Crowson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?