Mid-State Body Parts v. MQVP Inc

Case Number: 4:2003cv00733
Filed: September 12, 2003
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2012 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the 276 stipulation of dismissal filed by the parties today, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to either party. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/14/12. (vjt)
May 29, 2012 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that all pending motions 248 253 in this action are denied as moot without prejudice to the right of the parties to refile those motions if the decision of the U.S. Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit affirming the bankruptcy court's approval of the settlement in this matter is overturned. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/29/12. (vjt)
May 21, 2012 272 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED AMENDED 270 ORDER, directing the parties to complete any steps necessary to execute fully the settlement terms agreed upon at the settlement conference held on 10/28/09, and to file a stipulation for dismissal of this case, with prejudice, reciting that the settlement has been fully executed on or before 8/13/12. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/21/12. (vjt)
May 14, 2012 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to file a stipulation for dismissal of this case, with prejudice, reciting that the settlement has been fully executed, within 21 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/14/12. (vjt)
October 22, 2009 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing Matthew McKay to bring an electronic device to the courthouse for the Settlement Conference scheduled for Wednesday and Thursday, October 28-29, 2009, at 9:00 a.m.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 10/22/09. (mkf)
May 4, 2009 233 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that MQVP's 206 Emergency MOTION to Remove Counsel for Tampering with Non-Party Witness and Obstruction of Justice and for Default Judgment is hereby DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/4/09. (vjt)
April 27, 2009 231 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part Mid-State's 176 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Any Evidence That MQVP Was Not Given Adequate Access to Mid-State's Records or That Mid-State Engaged in Spoliation of Evidence; MQVP's motion for a spoliation instruction is denied as premature. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/27/09. (vjt)
April 24, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing co-counsel Todd P. Lewis to bring electronic devices into the courthouse between April 25, 2009 and May 1, 2009, subject to the rules outlined in this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/24/09. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mid-State Body Parts v. MQVP Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?