Sims v. SSA

Case Number: 4:2004cv00665
Filed: July 12, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Henry L. Jones
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 15, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendations and granting 36 Motion for Attorney Fees filed by Shunda Sims: The Commissioner shall certify and pay to Mr. James W. Stanley, Jr., attorney for plaintiff, $1,750.00 as attorney's fees, pursuant to the EAJA. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 5/15/09. (bkp)
May 1, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDED DISPOSITION recommending that 36 Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of Attorney Fees be granted. It is further recommended that the Commissioner certify and pay to Mr. James W. Stanley, Jr., attorney for Plaintiff, $1,750.00 as attorneys fees, pursuant to the EAJA. Objections to R&R due by 5/15/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 5/1/09. (hph)
February 4, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Shunda Sims against Social Security Administration re 34 Order remanding case to the Commissioner for further proceedings. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 2/4/09. (bkp)
October 15, 2008 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER rescinding 17 Order and noting James W. Stanley Jr.'s appearance as attorney of record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Henry L. Jones, Jr on 10/15/08. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?