Pet Quarters Inc, et al v. Rhino Advisors Inc, et al

Plaintiff: Pet Quarters Inc
Defendant: Ladenburg Thalmann and Company Inc, Michael Vasinkevich, Curzon Capital Corporation, Westminster Securities Corporation and John Does
Case Number: 4:2004cv00697
Filed: July 21, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2012 309 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 308 Joint Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/6/12. (kpr)
March 28, 2011 289 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 266 Motion for Reconsideration; denying 269 Motion for Reconsideration; and lifting the stay of discovery 264 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/28/11. (kpr)
February 18, 2011 283 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 281 282 Motion sfor Leave to Appear pro hac vicepro hac vice of Laura L. Gee and Gary M. Jewell. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/18/11. (bkp)
October 20, 2010 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying discovery and directing defts to brief the discovery stay issue in their motions to reconsider to be filed by October 29, 2010, and the Rule 16(b) conference will not be held on Thursday, October 21, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/20/10. (bkp)
July 26, 2010 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 256 Motion to Dismiss Party; granting 257 Motion to Dismiss Party and dismissing defts Thomas Badian, Rhino Advisors, Inc., Amro International, S.A., Spendid Rock Holdings, Ltd., James David Hassan, Markham Holdings Limited, and Hans Gassner with prejudice. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/26/10. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pet Quarters Inc, et al v. Rhino Advisors Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pet Quarters Inc
Represented By: James W. Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ladenburg Thalmann and Company Inc
Represented By: Howard J. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vasinkevich
Represented By: Jay S. Auslander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curzon Capital Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westminster Securities Corporation
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?