Rille et al v. Booz Allen Hamilton Inc et al

Plaintiff: Norman Rille and Neal Roberts
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2004cv00984
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 118 Motion to Transfer Case; the Clerk is directed to immediately TRANSFER this case to the USDC for Eastern District of Virginia, Alexandria Division. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/3/09. (mkf)
June 1, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to attorneys re defendant's motion to transfer venue. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/1/09. (bkp)
May 21, 2009 133 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 131 MOTION for Order Allowing EMC to File Reply Briefs filed by EMC Corporation, 132 Order on Motion for Order directing deft to file any reply brief by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, May 29, 2009, and limit each reply brief to ten pages. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/21/09. (bkp)
April 3, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Motion to Unseal Documents, 1 Complaint, 17 Amended Complaint, 24 Amended Complaint, 43 Amended Complaint, 56 Stipulation, 59 Order, and 64 MOTION to Dismiss Party. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/3/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rille et al v. Booz Allen Hamilton Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Rille
Represented By: Jacquetta F. Bardacos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neal Roberts
Represented By: Jacquetta F. Bardacos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor_plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Patricia R. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMC Corporation
Represented By: Sheila A. Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?