Rille, et al v. Accenture LLP, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv00985
Filed: September 17, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 19, 2016 809 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Consistent with 806 the parties' stipulation, the United States is directed to promptly release to Relators the sum of $14,008,500.Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/19/2016. (thd)
August 24, 2012 722 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying the case pending resolution of the California issues; denying 694 Motion for Attorney Fees; finding as moot 721 Motion for Leave to File Brief. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/24/12. (kpr)
August 4, 2012 716 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 714 Motion to Seal Accenture's Opposition to Relators' 694 MOTION for Attorney Fees . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/4/12. (kpr)
August 3, 2012 713 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 696 Motion to Seal; finding as moot 702 Motion for Leave to File; denying 703 Motion to Strike ; finding as moot 704 Motion to Shorten Time. The parties are directed to file, by 5:00 p.m., August 10, 2012, briefs explaining why this case should not be stayed until the California issues are resolved. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/3/12. (kpr)
July 31, 2012 710 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re telephone conference directing counsel to reply by Tuesday, July 31, 2012. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 7/31/12. (kpr)
June 27, 2012 699 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 695 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1-C, 1-D, and 3-B to Relators' 698 Memorandum in Support. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/27/12. (kpr)
October 11, 2011 648 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 644 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Regarding Sequencing for Filing Motions for Relator's Share and Attorney's Fees, Costs and Expenses and Request for Expedited Ruling filed by Neal Roberts, Norman Ri lle. On or before November 21, 2011, the Relators and U.S. shall either file a stipulation setting forth Relators' share of settlement proceeds, or Relators shall file their motion for determination of relators' share of settlement proceed s. If a Relators' Share Motion is filed, the USA's responsse to the Motion shall be due on or before December 12, 2011; and Relators shall be entitled to file a reply to the USA's response on or before December 23, 2011. Relators sha ll file their Motion for Statutory Attorneys' Fees, Costs and Expenses no later than 14 days after this Court enters an order either approving a stipulated agreement between Relators and the USA as to Relators' share of settlement proceeds or setting the Relators' share of settlement proceeds following the Relators' Share Motion, if no agreement is reached. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/11/11. (kpr)
June 16, 2011 623 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 620 Motion to Seal Defts' Motion to Strike Claims First Identified by the Government After May 16, 2011, as well as Defts' Memorandum in Suppport of said Motion, together with the Exhibits thereto, and the entire record. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/16/11. (kpr)
June 14, 2011 614 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 608 Motion to Seal United States' Opposition to Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony and Exhibits 1-8 thereto. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/14/11. (kpr)
June 1, 2011 568 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 546 Motion to Seal Defts' Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony, Defts' Memorandum in Support and Exhibits Thereto. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 6/1/11. (kpr)
May 16, 2011 536 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding that the following motions have been resolved: 311 Motion to Compel; 326 Motion to Compel; 417 Motion to Compel; 421 Motion to Compel; 424 Motion to Compel; and denying 444 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge John W. Cole on 5/13/11. (kpr)
May 5, 2011 525 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 466 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/5/11. (kpr)
April 11, 2011 484 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 468 MOTION TO SHORTEN RESPONSE TIME FOR MOTION PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 7.2(b) filed by Accenture LLP. Plaintiff is ordered to respond to the Motion to Compel by Monday, April 11, 2011. Signed by Judge John W. Cole on 4/7/11. (kpr)
April 4, 2011 474 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 470 Motion to Seal Document and directing the Clerk of this Court to file under seal paper copies of the unredacted Relators' opposition to the motion for partial summary judgment and unredacted versions of exhibits 1 and 2 thereto. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/4/11. (kpr)
March 29, 2011 464 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 463 Motion to Seal Document MOTION TO SEAL DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITH RESPECT TO ORGANIZATIONAL CONFLICT OF INTEREST. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/19/11. (kpr)
March 22, 2011 460 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 459 Motion to Seal the U.S.'s Statement of Material Facts and its incorporated Exhibits thereto. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/22/11. (kpr)
February 22, 2011 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 445 Motion to Seal Document Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, together with Memorandum in support thereof and Exhibits (including the Statement of Material Facts as to Which There is no Genuine Issue and its incorporated Exhibits). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/22/11. (bkp)
January 27, 2011 435 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 398 Motion to Seal Accenture's Motion and Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/27/11. (bkp)
January 26, 2011 429 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 423 Motion to Seal DEFENDANT ACCENTURES MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT C TO ITS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL THE DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS FROM RELATED CASES PERTAINING TO PAYMENTS MADE BY HEWLETT-PAC. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/26/11. (bkp)
January 18, 2011 419 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing possession of electronic devices in courthouse by J. Andrew Jackson and Jason Wallach while attending Special Master hearing set for January 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/18/11. (bkp)
December 10, 2010 405 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 372 Motion for Discovery and directing the defts to make Mr. Birchmeier, Ms. Hagene, Mr. Goodman and Mr. Mate available to counsel for the United States for 14 hours of deposition over two days. Signed by Judge John W. Cole on 12/10/10. (bkp)
November 29, 2010 392 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 385 Motion to Seal; the Clerk is directed to file under seal the Response and attached exhibits. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/29/10. (vjt)
November 18, 2010 380 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 358 Motion to Seal Exhibits 1 and 2 to Relators' Reply Memorandum in Support of their Motion to Compel Discovery Concerning Equity Alliance Benefits and directing the Clerk of this Court to file the paper copies of Exhibits 1 and 2 under seal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/18/10. (bkp)
November 16, 2010 375 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 373 Motion to Seal and directing the Clerk to file the paper copy of Accenture LLP's Motion for Protective Order and Memorandum in Support under seal. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/16/10. (bkp)
October 18, 2010 370 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 369 Motion for Assent Motion Regarding Scope of Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge John W. Cole on 10/18/10. (bkp)
October 12, 2010 367 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 363 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice and directing Joseph Berger, Deborah Ringel and Adam Proujansky to register for CM/ECF by 5 p.m., Friday, October 29, 2010. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 10/12/10. (bkp)
August 6, 2010 350 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 345 ORDER granting 337 Assent Motion Regarding Deadlines for Opposition to Motion to Compel Discovery and Other Matters During Mediation Period. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/6/10. (vjt)
July 29, 2010 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 313 316 322 324 328 330 333 Motions to Seal Documents. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/29/10. (bkp)
March 8, 2010 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding production of documents. Signed by Judge Judge John W. Cole on 3/8/10. (bkp)
December 18, 2009 301 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Staying Briefing Schedule on Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Non-Privilieged Documents and Request for Related Discovery Relief from Accenture. Signed by Special Master John W. Cole on 12/18/09. (mkf)
December 14, 2009 298 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER allowing Accenture to permit a response to the 146 MOTION for Order filed by Neal Roberts, Norman Rille on or before December 22, 2009; plaintiff shall have until on or before January 4, 2010 to file their reply. Signed by Special Master John W. Cole on 12/14/09. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 12/17/2009 to correct the signer.) (thd)
August 3, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re deadlines set out in 275 Order ; production by defendants of the electronically stored information of the Group 1 Witnesses is hereby extended from July 30, 2009 until August 15, 2009. Signed by Judge John W. Cole, Special Master on 8/3/09. (mkf)
July 27, 2009 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Production of Certain Accenture Documents Under the Terms of the Court's General Protective Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/27/09. (mkf)
July 24, 2009 279 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 248 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/24/09. (bkp)
July 8, 2009 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Regarding Production of Documents. Signed by Judge John W. Cole, Special Master, on 7/8/09. (bkp)
May 28, 2009 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER substituting The Honorable John Cole for Mr. John Everett as Special Master in this case, and directing the Clerk's office to change the docket to reflect this substitution. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/28/09. (bkp)
May 26, 2009 256 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 255 Order authorizing counsel to bring into the Courthouse on May 28, 2009, certain electronic devices. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 5/26/09. (bkp)
April 28, 2009 246 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to Judge John Cole re service as Special Master for discovery in this case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/28/09. (bkp)
April 20, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER authorizing possession of electronic devices in Courthouse on April 24, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/20/09. (bkp)
April 6, 2009 228 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER regarding billing of fees and expenses as Special Master. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/6/09. (mkf)
April 3, 2009 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 168 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/3/09. (mkf)
March 30, 2009 223 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER re special master John Everett. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/30/09. (bkp)
March 23, 2009 220 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 218 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/23/09. (bkp)
March 20, 2009 219 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPERSEDING ORDER re 212 Order Granting Assent Motion re: Production of Third-Party Documents Under the Terms of the Court's General Protective Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/20/2009. (thd)
March 13, 2009 207 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER to John C. Everett re special master for discovery. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/13/09. (bkp)
March 9, 2009 204 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER from Hon. William R. Wilson, Jr. to Mr. John Calhoun, Jr. re special master for discovery. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/9/09. (bkp)
February 11, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER ORDER asking opposing counsel to respond to Mr. Engstrom's suggestion re: the alignment of parties; said response should be submitted by email or fax by noon this Friday, February 13, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/11/09. (mkf)
January 21, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 157 Sealed Motion. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/21/09. (mkf)
January 6, 2009 148 Opinion or Order of the Court GENERAL PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding discovery disclosures. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/6/09. (mkf)
December 11, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 122 Motion to Compel Production of Documents and for Sanctions; Plaintiffs' Motion to compel is GRANTED; Plaintiffs' Motion for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/11/08. (mkf)
December 10, 2008 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER regarding two issues brought up in the December 4, 2008 teleconference in an effort to finalize a protective order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 12/10. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rille, et al v. Accenture LLP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?