Laferrara, et al v. Wyeth Inc

Case Number: 4:2004cv02271
Filed: December 13, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2010 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 54 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 6/18/10. (bkp)
April 1, 2010 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Oral Motion for Consolidation of the Hill and Laferrara cases; Plaintiffs' oral motion to consolidate is DENIED. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 4/1/2010. (mkf)
March 2, 2010 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER scheduling this case for trial commencing on July 20, 2010, if Helen Hill v. Wyeth, 4:05-CV-00546 WRW, settles; a scheduling order will be filed forthwith. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/2/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laferrara, et al v. Wyeth Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?