Bauman, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al

Case Number: 4:2004cv02298
Filed: December 20, 2004
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 29, 2010 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 10 Order on Motion to Sever; any dropped plaintiffs in the cases identified in Exhibit A who filed lawsuits in compliance with the order dropping plaintiffs may, w/i 30 days of this Order, file amended complaints, or motions for leave to file amended complaints, to modify the newly filed complaints solely to add Wyeth LLC as a defendant. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/29/2010. (mkf)
February 23, 2010 13 Opinion or Order of the Court MDL PRETRIAL ORDER for REMANDED CASES and SUGGESTION of REMAND. The Court suggests that the cases listed in Exhibit A and Exhibit B are ripe for remand by the JPML to the transferor courts for further proceedings, including final disposition. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 2/23/10. (mkf)
January 20, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Sever; every plaintiff other than the first named plaintiff is DROPPED from this civil action; the Clerk is directed to send a contemporaneous copy of this order to the MDL panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL No. 1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 1/20/10. (mkf)
March 17, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A, who have not already done so, to submit updated medical authorization to Wyeth by 5 p.m., April 17, 2009. Failure todo so may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/17/09. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bauman, et al v. Wyeth Inc, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?