Fenner et al v. Wyeth et al

Case Number: 4:2005cv01886
Filed: December 19, 2005
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 15, 2011 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER designating cases to proceed with case-specific discovery under Practice and Procedure Order 9. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/15/2011. (jct)
March 30, 2010 144 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER re 143 Order on Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/30/2010. (mkf)
March 4, 2010 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER finding as moot 139 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Linda Banks's claims against certain defendants; every plaintiff other than the first named plaintiff is DROPPED from this civil action; the Clerk is directed to send a contemporaneous copy of this order to the MDL panel to allow, to the extent possible, fast-tracking of 1407 transfers of these cases back to MDL-1507 for coordinated and consolidated pretrial proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 3/4/2010. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenner et al v. Wyeth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?