Thomas v. Chan et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv00465
Filed: April 14, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 14, 2011 298 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL pursuant to the terms of the settlement agreement as stated herein. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/14/11. (vjt)
January 31, 2011 297 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting pltf's 296 Motion to Extend Stay of Proceedings until settlement is approved. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/31/11. (vjt)
December 20, 2010 295 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 294 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings; the proceedings in this matter are suspended and held in abeyance until 2/4/11. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/20/10. (vjt)
November 19, 2010 293 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 292 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings; proceedings in this matter are suspended and held in abeyance until 12/17/10. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/19/10. (vjt)
May 10, 2010 291 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING PROCEEDINGS granting 290 Joint Motion to Stay; this matter will be held in abeyance for a period of 6 months from entry of this Order; the Final Scheduling Order 271 is hereby vacated, and all pending motions are denied without prejudice 278 283 288 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/10/10. (vjt)
December 23, 2008 239 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 229 Motion for Partial Reconsideration & for leave to file a third amended complaint. The relator must file his third amended complaint within five days of entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/23/08. (jct)
November 6, 2008 223 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER that Pltf's 174 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; as this action will proceed on one claim for relief alleged in the proposed second amended complaint, the following motions are deemed moot 45 60 95 97 101 103 and 130 . Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/6/08. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Chan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?