Steinbuch v. Cutler et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Robert Steinbuch
Defendant: Jessica Cutler, Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide, Time Warner and Home Box Office
Case Number: 4:2006cv00620
Filed: May 30, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: P.I.: Other Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 15, 2010 173 MANDATE of USCA In accordance with the judgment of 01/15/2010,as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch (dac)
January 15, 2010 172 USCA JUDGMENT as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch is dismissed on appellant's motion (dac)
November 13, 2009 171 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 67 Notice of Appeal, 71 Opinion, 72 Judgment, and 73 Mandate: the Mandate is recalled, the Judgment is vacated, and the appeal is reopened; the case will be held in abeyance pending an order from the Bankruptcy Court either dismissing the bankruptcy or lifting the automatic stay as to Appellee Jessica Cutler. (mkf)
November 12, 2009 170 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Hyperion Books. (Anderson, Philip)
October 6, 2009 169 Featured Case ORDER pursuant to 168 Consent MOTION for a Continued Stay, this consolidated action is hereby STAYED for a period of 45 days. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/6/09. (vjt)
October 5, 2009 168 Joint MOTION to Stay by Robert Steinbuch, Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
July 29, 2009 167 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot pltf's 154 motion to amend complaint; CONSOLIDATING CASE 4:06cv620 with LEAD CASE 4:08cv456; Steinbuch is directed to file his amended complaint in Case No. 4:08cv456 naming Hyperion and Hachette as defts (deft Cutler has been dismissed), within 30 days of the entry of this Order; upon the filing of the amended complaint in Case No. 4:08cv456, Case No. 4:06cv620 will be administratively terminated. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/29/09. (vjt)
July 29, 2009 166 Featured Case ORDER that Pltf's 163 motion for ruling on Deft's discovery obligations, which asks that Deft be required to respond to all discovery on the question of personal jurisdiction is DENIED; Deft's 164 cross motion for protective order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/29/09. (vjt)
July 28, 2009 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 163 Response. CORRECTION: The docket entry was modified to change the filing event and correct the description of the document filed as "RESPONSE re 162 Notice to Withdraw and MOTION for Ruling on Defendant's Discovery Obligations."(thd)
July 28, 2009 165 RESPONSE to Motion re 163 MOTION for Ruling (Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Ruling on Defendant's Discovery Obligations and Brief in Support of Cross-Motion for a Protective Order) filed by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Stone, Clayborne)
July 28, 2009 164 Cross MOTION for Protective Order by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
July 27, 2009 163 RESPONSE re 162 Notice to Withdraw and MOTION for Ruling on Defendant's Discovery Obligations by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan) (Docket entry modified on 7/28/2009 to change filing event and correct the docket text.) (thd)
July 24, 2009 162 NOTICE by Hyperion Books (Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and Response to Order of July 23, 2009 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Stone, Clayborne)
July 23, 2009 161 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 157 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time; and directing Defendant to submit its proposed protective order together with any arguments for its position no later that the close of business 7/24/09. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/23/09. (hph)
July 23, 2009 160 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 157 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Hyperion's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Protective Order Governing Jurisdictional Discovery) filed by Hyperion Books. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/23/09. (bkp)
July 22, 2009 159 RESPONSE in Opposition re 157 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Hyperion's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Protective Order Governing Jurisdictional Discovery) filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Rosen, Jonathan)
July 22, 2009 158 STATUS REPORT Re: Protective Order filed purusant to this Court's Order (Doc. # 152) by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rosen, Jonathan)
July 22, 2009 157 MOTION for Extension of Time to File (Hyperion's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit a Proposed Protective Order Governing Jurisdictional Discovery) by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
July 20, 2009 156 Featured Case ORDER granting Hyperion's 155 Motion for Extension of Time until 8/4/09 to respond to Pltf's 154 MOTION to Amend Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/20/09. (vjt)
July 17, 2009 155 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 154 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
July 10, 2009 154 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Amended Complaint, # 2 Exhibit Ex1 to Amended Complaint, # 3 Exhibit Ex2 to Amended Complaint, # 4 Exhibit Ex3 to Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit Ex4 to Amended Complaint, # 6 Exhibit Ex5 to Amended Complaint)(Rosen, Jonathan)
July 9, 2009 153 Featured Case ORDER, all discovery re issue of whether Hyperion Books is subject to the general jurisdiction of the courts of the State of Arkansas must be completed on or before 10/6/09; if Hyperion wishes to file another motion to dismiss, it must be filed on or before 10/13/09; response to said motion due 10/27/09, and any reply is due 11/3/09. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/9/09. (vjt)
July 2, 2009 152 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part Pltf's 136 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 7/2/09. (vjt)
June 5, 2009 150 Featured Case ORDER granting 149 Motion for Nathan E. Siegel and John B. O'Keefe to Appear pro hac vice as co-counsel for Hyperion Books. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/09. (vjt)
June 4, 2009 149 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice) by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
May 26, 2009 148 RESPONSE re 147 Status Report by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
May 22, 2009 147 STATUS REPORT re: Motion to Compel by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Transcript of Telephone Hearing on Scope of Discovery before Chief Judge Holmes on 9/18/08)(Rosen, Jonathan)
May 22, 2009 146 STATUS REPORT by Hyperion Books. (Stone, Clayborne)
May 15, 2009 145 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 136 MOTION to Compel filed by Robert Steinbuch. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/09. (bkp)
May 14, 2009 144 Featured Case ORDER directing parties to file separate Status Reports on or before 5/22/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau on 5/14/09. (vjt)
May 13, 2009 143 Featured Case ORDER denying HBO's 134 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/13/09. (vjt)
May 11, 2009 142 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING 136 MOTION to Compel filed by Robert Steinbuch to Magistrate Judge Jerry W. Cavaneau for disposition. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/11/09. (vjt)
May 8, 2009 141 REPLY re 139 Response (Non Motion) (Reply in Support of Statement in Response to Court's September 18, 2008 Order) by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 7, 2009 140 RESPONSE to Motion re 136 MOTION to Compel filed by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 3, 2009 139 RESPONSE re 138 Notice (Other) by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 28, 2009 138 NOTICE by Hyperion Books re 105 Order on Motion to Extend Time, (Statement in Response to Court's Order) (Stone, Clayborne)
April 28, 2009 137 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Robert Steinbuch re 136 Motion to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Rosen, Jonathan)
April 28, 2009 136 MOTION to Compel by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 20, 2009 135 RESPONSE to Motion re 134 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Sanctions filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 13, 2009 134 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Order Denying Sanctions by Home Box Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hancock, Claire)
April 8, 2009 133 Featured Case ORDER that Pltf's Motions to preclude Hyperion from filing another motion to dismiss 117 , and for the Court to find jurisdiction and for other relief 129 are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/8/09. (vjt)
April 8, 2009 132 Featured Case ORDER denying 108 Pltf's Rule 60 Motion; HBO's 123 Motion for Sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/8/09. (vjt) (Modified on 4/8/2009 to correct text) (vjt).
January 26, 2009 131 RESPONSE to Motion re 129 MOTION for Relief to Preclude Hyperion from Asserting a Jurisdictional Defense, for a Finding of Jurisdiction, and for Sanctions filed by Hyperion Books. (Stone, Clayborne)
January 13, 2009 130 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Robert Steinbuch re 129 Motion for Relief (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rosen, Jonathan)
January 13, 2009 129 MOTION for Relief to Preclude Hyperion from Asserting a Jurisdictional Defense, for a Finding of Jurisdiction, and for Sanctions by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Rosen, Jonathan)
January 9, 2009 128 RESPONSE to Motion re 117 MOTION for Ruling to Preclude Hyperion from Filing a Motion to Dismiss on Jurisdictional Grounds filed by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8)(Stone, Clayborne)
December 26, 2008 127 RESPONSE to Motion re 123 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Rosen, Jonathan)
December 22, 2008 126 Featured Case ORDER granting Hyperion's 120 Motion for Extension of Time until 1/9/09 to respond to Pltf's 117 MOTION to Preclude Hyperion from filing a Motion to Dismiss on Jurisdictional Grounds. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/08. (vjt)
December 22, 2008 125 Featured Case ORDER denying Hyperion Books' 118 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/22/08. (vjt)
December 19, 2008 124 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Home Box Office re 123 Motion for Sanctions (Hancock, Claire)
December 19, 2008 123 MOTION for Sanctions by Home Box Office (Hancock, Claire)
December 19, 2008 122 REPLY to Response to Motion re 111 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Rule 60 Motion - Surreply of Defendant Home Box Office, Inc. in Response to Plaintiff's Reply Re Motion Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.60 filed by Home Box Office. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A, B)(Hancock, Claire)
December 19, 2008 121 RESPONSE to Motion re 120 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
December 19, 2008 120 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
December 19, 2008 119 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 118 Motion for Protective Order (Stone, Clayborne)
December 19, 2008 118 Third MOTION for Protective Order by Hyperion Books (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
December 15, 2008 117 MOTION for Ruling to Preclude Hyperion from Filing a Motion to Dismiss on Jurisdictional Grounds by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-Hyperion's Discovery "Responses")(Rosen, Jonathan)
December 15, 2008 116 Featured Case ORDER granting 115 Motion for Leave to File surreply to plaintiff's reply in support of his Rule 60 motion. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/15/08. (bkp)
December 8, 2008 115 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Home Box Office (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 and its Exhibits A, B)(Marts, Gary)
December 7, 2008 114 NOTICE by Robert Steinbuch re 113 Reply to Response to Motion,, Notice of Additional Citation (Rosen, Jonathan)
December 1, 2008 113 REPLY to Response to Motion re 108 MOTION for Relief From Judgment or Order--Rule 60 filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3--"Washingtonienne" Show, # 4 Exhibit 4-"Washingtonienne" Show, # 5 Exhibit 5-HBO TV Show, # 6 Exhibit 6-Hyperion Advertisement, # 7 Exhibit 7-Hyperion Post-Litigation Advertisement, # 8 Exhibit 8-8th Cir. Op., # 9 Exhibit 9-Injunctive Relief Case, # 10 Exhibit 10-Cutler's Hometown Paper's Description of her Recent "Activities")(Rosen, Jonathan)
December 1, 2008 112 Featured Case ORDER granting Pltf's 111 Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in support of his 108 Rule 60 Motion; Pltf's reply brief due within 5 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/1/08. (vjt)
November 26, 2008 111 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Rule 60 Motion by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 (Sarah Jessica Parker/Sex in the City, # 3 Exhibit 3-Washingtonienne TV Show, # 4 Exhibit 4-Washingtonienne TV Show, # 5 Exhibit 5-HBO TV Show, # 6 Exhibit 6-Hyperion Advertisement, # 7 Exhibit 7-Hyperion Replacement Ad, # 8 Exhibit 8-8th Cir. Op., # 9 Exhibit 9-Brad Pitt Case, # 10 Exhibit 10-NY Post-Cutler)(Rosen, Jonathan)
November 13, 2008 110 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Home Box Office re 109 Response in Opposition to Motion (Hancock, Claire)
November 13, 2008 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION for Relief From Judgment or Order--Rule 60 filed by Home Box Office. (Hancock, Claire)
November 2, 2008 108 MOTION for Relief From Judgment or Order--Rule 60 by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit HBO's Current Behavior)(Rosen, Jonathan)
October 23, 2008 107 Letter from USCA Clerk, petition for a writ of certiorari is denied by the U S Supreme Court (dac)
September 22, 2008 106 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on September 18, 2008, before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Court Reporter Eugenie M. Power. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 10/6/2008. Redaction Request due 10/14/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/22/2008. (plm)
September 18, 2008 105 Featured Case ORDER re: 9/18/2008 telephone hearing regarding the scope of discovery; granting 98 Plaintiff's Motion to extend time; and, granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's motion for discovery. Signed by Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/18/2008. (thd)
September 18, 2008 104 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes: Telephone Conference held on Thursday, 9/18/2008 regarding status of case; Jonathan Rosen present for plaintiff; Philip Anderson, Clayborne Stone present for defendants; Court addresses deposition issues and status of case; order to follow. (Court Reporter G. Power) (cdw)
September 11, 2008 103 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Judge J. Leon Holmes for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 9/11/08. (bfw)
September 2, 2008 102 ADDENDUM filed by Hyperion Books - Exhibit 1 to Telephone Conference of 8/19/2008 (Text Entry only). (maj)
September 2, 2008 101 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Hearing held on August 19, 2008, before Judge William R. Wilson Jr.. Court Reporter Cheryl Bartnett Nelson. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 9/15/2008. Redaction Request due 9/23/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/3/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/1/2008. (plm)
September 1, 2008 100 RESPONSE in Support re 98 MOTION to Extend Time & Production of Plaintiff's Discovery to Court, Both Filed Pursuant to Court's Order & Request for Leave to file the Response the same length as Defendant's statement of objections filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 27, 2008 99 RESPONSE to Motion re 98 MOTION to Extend Time & Production of Plaintiff's Discovery to Court, Both Filed Pursuant to Court's Order (Response to Plaintiff's Proposed "Discovery of Defendant and Request for Court to Reset Dates") filed by Hyperion Books. (Stone, Clayborne)
August 22, 2008 98 MOTION to Extend Time & Production of Plaintiff's Discovery to Court, Both Filed Pursuant to Court's Order by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 19, 2008 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Telephone Conference held on 8/19/2008 re discovery matters; pltf to submit discovery requests by 8/22/2008; deft to respond by 8/27/2008; pltf reply due 8/29/2008 and the Court will rule shortly thereafter. (Court Reporter C. Nelson) (maj)
August 18, 2008 97 REPLY to Response to Motion re 92 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Anderson, Philip)
August 18, 2008 96 RESPONSE to Motion re 92 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 18, 2008 95 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that 94 Response to Motion lacks a certificate showing service of the document on all parties (F.R.Cv.P.5). (thd)
August 17, 2008 94 RESPONSE to Motion re 92 MOTION to Extend Time filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 15, 2008 93 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 92 Defendant's Motion to Extend Time. No discovery responses are due until after the telephone conference that will be held next week -- most likely on Tuesday, August 19, 2008.Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 08/15/08. (dmm)
August 15, 2008 92 MOTION to Extend Time by Hyperion Books (Stone, Clayborne)
August 4, 2008 91 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER denying without prejudice 88 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order, since Defendant failed to comply with Local Rule 7.2(g). Additionally, based on Plaintiff's response, it appears that the issue is moot. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 08/03/08. (dmm)
August 3, 2008 90 RESPONSE in Opposition re 88 Second MOTION for Protective Order filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
August 1, 2008 89 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 88 Motion for Protective Order (Stone, Clayborne)
August 1, 2008 88 Second MOTION for Protective Order by Hyperion Books (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 1A, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 2A, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 3A, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5)(Stone, Clayborne)
July 30, 2008 87 Featured Case ORDER denying 83 Motion to Compel; granting 84 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/30/08. (mkf)
July 30, 2008 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 83 First MOTION to Compel. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the Brief in Support was filed as an attachment to docket entry 83 in error. The Brief in Support was filed separately as docket entry 86 by the Clerk's office. (thd)
July 29, 2008 85 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 84 Motion for Protective Order (Stone, Clayborne)
July 29, 2008 84 MOTION for Protective Order by Hyperion Books (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Stone, Clayborne)
July 27, 2008 86 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Robert Steinbuch re 83 Motion to Compel. (thd)
July 27, 2008 83 First MOTION to Compel by Robert Steinbuch (Attachments: # 2 Defendant's Document Refusing to Respond to Discovery Requests, # 3 Plaintiff's Discovery Request, # 4 Plaintiff's Requests for Admission)(Rosen, Jonathan) (Docket text modified on 7/30/2008 to indicate the brief in support was filed as an attachment in error.) (thd)
July 22, 2008 82 Letter from USCA Clerk, the petition for a writ of certiorari was filed in the U S Supreme Court on 7/8/08 and placed on the docket 7/14/08 as No. 08-52 (dac)
July 22, 2008 81 Featured Case ORDER advising parties that they may begin jurisdictional discovery immediately; deft Hyperion Books will have until 5:00 p.m. Monday, October 6, 2008, to re-file its Motion to Dismiss and pltf Robert Steinbuch will have until 5:00 p.m. Monday, November 3, 2008, to file his Response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/22/08. (mkf)
July 17, 2008 80 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Robert Steinbuch, Hyperion Books. (Stone, Clayborne)
July 1, 2008 79 Featured Case ORDER denying 75 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/1/08. (mkf)
May 12, 2008 78 NOTICE of Change of Address by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan)
May 9, 2008 77 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 76 Response to Motion to Transfer (Stone, Clayborne)
May 9, 2008 76 RESPONSE to Motion re 75 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Stone, Clayborne)
May 1, 2008 75 MOTION to Transfer Case by Robert Steinbuch (Rosen, Jonathan)
April 29, 2008 74 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER (DOC): Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 7/1/2008; Rule 26(f) Report due by 7/15/2008; Jury Trial set for 6/16/2009 at 9:00 AM in Little Rock Courtroom #4C before Judge William R. Wilson Jr. (maj)
April 22, 2008 73 MANDATE of USCA in accordance with the opinion and judgment of 3/6/08 as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch (dac)
March 6, 2008 72 USCA JUDGMENT as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch. Judgment of the district court is affirmed in part, reversed in part, and remanded to the district court for proceedings consistent with the opinion of this court. (dac)
March 6, 2008 71 OPINION of USCA, we affirm the judgment of the district court dismissing Disney World Publishing, Time Warner, and Home Box Office. We reverse the final judgment entered in favor of Hyperion Books, and remand for further proceedings not inconsistent with this opinion and for discovery on the issue of whether general personal jurisdiction exists over Hyperion, as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch (dac)
March 7, 2007 70 USCA Scheduling Order counsel to proceed on appendix as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch. (dac)
March 7, 2007 69 USCA Docketing Letter as to 67 Notice of Appeal filed by Robert Steinbuch. USCA Case Number 07-1509 (dac)
March 6, 2007 *** COA BATCH RECEIPT of Notice of Appeal and related supporting documents sent on: Tue Mar 6 07:58:30 CST 2007 (COA1, )
March 5, 2007 68 NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA SUPPLEMENT as to 66 Judgment, 65 Order on Motion to Dismiss 67 Notice of Appeal. (dac)
March 5, 2007 67 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 66 Judgment, 65 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Robert Steinbuch. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number LIT004945. (Attachments: # 1 Appeal Info forms "A" and "B")(dac)
February 7, 2007 66 JUDGMENT re 65 Order on Motions to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Strike; Pltf's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for lack of personal jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 2/7/07. (mkf, )
February 7, 2007 65 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 38 40 44 Motions to Dismiss, denying 61 Motion to Strike; Complaint is DISMISSED . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 2/7/07. (mkf, )
January 2, 2007 64 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 63 Defendants' Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Accordingly, Mrs. Beth M. Deere is relieved as counsel of record. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 01/02/07. (dmm, )
December 29, 2006 63 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Disney Publishing Worldwide. (Deere, Beth)
November 20, 2006 62 RESPONSE to Motion re 61 MOTION to Strike 56 Response in Support of Motion, 60 Response in Support of Motion,, 59 Response in Support of Motion,, 58 Response in Support of Motion,, 57 Response in Support of Motion filed by Home Box Office, Time Warner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hancock, Claire)
November 13, 2006 61 MOTION to Strike 56 Response in Support of Motion, 60 Response in Support of Motion,, 59 Response in Support of Motion,, 58 Response in Support of Motion,, 57 Response in Support of Motion by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan)
October 27, 2006 60 RESPONSE in Support re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ OF RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Jessica Cutler. (Deere, Beth)
October 27, 2006 59 RESPONSE in Support re 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ REPLY IN SUPPORT OF RULE 12(b)(2) MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Hyperion Books. (Deere, Beth)
October 26, 2006 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 57 Response in Support of Motion. CORRECTION: Docket text modified to indicate document filed in error (duplicate entry.) (thd)
October 26, 2006 58 RESPONSE in Support re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ filed by Disney Publishing Worldwide. (Deere, Beth)
October 25, 2006 57 DUPLICATE ENTRY (see 56 above) - DISREGARD. (Hancock, Claire) (Docket text modified on 10/26/2006 to indicate duplicate entry.) (thd)
October 25, 2006 56 RESPONSE in Support re 44 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Home Box Office, Time Warner. (Hancock, Claire)
October 10, 2006 55 RESPONSE in Opposition re 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix 1# 2 Appendix 2# 3 Appendix 3# 4 Appendix 4# 5 Appendix 5# 6 Appendix 6# 7 Appendix 7# 8 Appendix 8# 9 Appendix 9)(Rosen, Jonathan)
September 19, 2006 54 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 53 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Hyperion Books. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 9/19/06. (mkf, )
September 13, 2006 53 MOTION for Protective Order by Hyperion Books. (Deere, Beth)
September 11, 2006 52 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 46 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re 38 28 44 40 MOTIONS to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; Pltf's response must be filed by 5 p.m., Tuesday, October 10, 2006; all discovery is STAYED pending the resolution of the motions to dismiss . Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 9/11/06. (mkf, )
September 10, 2006 51 RESPONSE to Motion re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ RESPONSE OPPOSING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8# 9 Exhibit 9# 10 Exhibit 10# 11 Exhibit 11# 12 Exhibit 12# 13 Exhibit 13)(Rosen, Jonathan)
September 4, 2006 50 REPLY to Response to Motion re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ Plaintiff's First Motion for an Extension of Time filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E-mail to Counsel for HBO & Time-Warner)(Rosen, Jonathan)
August 31, 2006 49 RESPONSE to Motion re 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, [ filed by Home Box Office, Time Warner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hancock, Claire)
August 31, 2006 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 47 Response to Motion for Extension of Time and 48 Brief in Support. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to correct the description of the document filed and include the Motion to Stay Discovery. (thd)
August 30, 2006 48 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Jessica Cutler, Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide re 47 Response to Motion and Motion to Stay Discovery. (Deere, Beth) (Docket text modified on 8/31/2006 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd)
August 30, 2006 47 RESPONSE to 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, filed by Jessica Cutler, Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide and MOTION to Stay Discovery (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F)(Deere, Beth). (Docket text modified on 8/31/2006 to correct the description of document filed.)(thd) Modified on 8/31/2006 (thd, ).
August 22, 2006 46 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 44 MOTION to Dismiss, 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), 45 Brief in Support, 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1), Addendum, 39 Brief in Support, 41 Brief in Support, 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Robert Steinbuch. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent to Disney-Hyperion# 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Consent to HBO-Time-Warner# 3 Exhibit Sample Order)(Rosen, Jonathan)
August 18, 2006 45 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Home Box Office, Time Warner re 44 Motion to Dismiss. (Hancock, Claire)
August 18, 2006 44 MOTION to Dismiss by Home Box Office, Time Warner. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E)(Hancock, Claire)
August 18, 2006 SEALED EXHIBIT re: 40 Motion to Dismiss filed by Hyperion Books. Received in paper and maintained in the Clerk's office. (thd)
August 18, 2006 43 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Home Box Office identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (Hancock, Claire)
August 18, 2006 42 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Time Warner identifying None as Corporate Parent.. (Hancock, Claire)
August 18, 2006 41 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 40 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 40 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hyperion Books. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Document Filed Under Seal)(Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 39 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Disney Publishing Worldwide re 38 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 38 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Disney Publishing Worldwide. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Hyperion Books identifying The Walt Disney Company as Corporate Parent.. (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 36 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Disney Publishing Worldwide identifying The Walt Disney Company as Corporate Parent.. (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 35 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 26 Defendant's Motion to Seal Exhibit to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 08/18/06. (dmm, )
August 18, 2006 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire Shows Hancock on behalf of Home Box Office, Time Warner (Hancock, Claire)
August 18, 2006 33 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayborne S. Stone on behalf of Jessica Cutler (Stone, Clayborne)
August 18, 2006 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess L. Askew, III on behalf of Jessica Cutler (Askew, Jess)
August 18, 2006 31 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip S. Anderson on behalf of Jessica Cutler (Anderson, Philip)
August 18, 2006 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Beth M. Deere on behalf of Jessica Cutler (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 29 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Jessica Cutler re 28 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Deere, Beth)
August 18, 2006 28 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Jessica Cutler. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C)(Deere, Beth)
August 17, 2006 27 BRIEF IN SUPPORT filed by Hyperion Books re 26 Motion to Seal Document. (Deere, Beth)
August 17, 2006 26 MOTION to Seal Document by Hyperion Books. (Deere, Beth)
August 1, 2006 25 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 24 Deficiency Letter. (thd)
August 1, 2006 24 Deficiency Letter from Clerk of Court notifying party that 23 Response to Motion for Extension of Time lacks a certificate of service showing service of the document on all parties (F.R.Cv.P.5). (thd)
July 28, 2006 23 RESPONSE to Motion re 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Amended Complaint filed by Robert Steinbuch. (Rosen, Jonathan) (MODIFICATION: A document with the certificate of service was added as an attachment on 8/1/2006.) (thd)
July 25, 2006 22 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (mkf, )
July 25, 2006 21 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 20 Defendant Jessica Cutler's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant Jessica Cutler must file her answer by 5 p.m., 8/18/2006. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 07/25/06. (dmm, )
July 25, 2006 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 4 Amended Complaint by Jessica Cutler. (mkf, )
July 11, 2006 19 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk of 18 Text Entry Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (jct)
July 10, 2006 18 Featured Case (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant Home Box Office's answer must be filed by 5 p.m., 8/18/2006. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 07/10/06. (dmm, )
July 7, 2006 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Home Box Office. (Marts, Gary)
July 5, 2006 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Philip S. Anderson on behalf of Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide (Anderson, Philip)
July 5, 2006 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Clayborne S. Stone on behalf of Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide (Stone, Clayborne)
July 5, 2006 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Jess L. Askew, III on behalf of Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide (Askew, Jess)
July 3, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hyperion Books answer due 8/18/2006. (mkf, )
July 3, 2006 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Steinbuch. Time Warner served on 6/19/2006, answer due 7/10/2006. (mkf, )
July 3, 2006 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service, filed by Robert Steinbuch. Home Box Office served on 6/19/2006, answer due 7/10/2006. (mkf, )
July 3, 2006 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Steinbuch. Disney Publishing Worldwide served on 6/23/2006, answer due 8/18/2006. (mkf, )
July 3, 2006 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and First Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Steinbuch. Hyperion Books served on 6/23/2006, answer due 8/18/2006. (mkf, ) (Modified on 7/03/06 to correct answer due date, mkf.)
July 3, 2006 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons & First Amended Complaint, filed by Robert Steinbuch. Jessica Cutler served on 6/21/2006, answer due 7/11/2006. (mkf, )
June 30, 2006 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hyperion Books and Disney Publishing Worldwide answer due 8/18/2006. (vjt)
June 30, 2006 8 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 7 Order, Terminate Motions (vjt)
June 30, 2006 7 Featured Case ORDER granting defts Hyperion Books and Disney Publishing's motion for extension of time 5 until 8/18/06 to answer complaint. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson Jr. on 6/30/06. (vjt)
June 30, 2006 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: 5 MOTION for Extension of Time. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error; the correct document was added to entry 5 , pursuant to the attached request. (thd)
June 29, 2006 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 4 Amended Complaint by Hyperion Books, Disney Publishing Worldwide. (Deere, Beth) (MODIFICATION: The original document was submitted in error; the correct document was added as an attachment on 6/30/2006.) (thd)
June 22, 2006 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION: 4 Amended Complaint - (modified entry to add jury demand) (bfw)
June 15, 2006 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with jury demand against all defendants filed by Robert Steinbuch. (bkp, ) (Modified entry on 6/22/2006 to add jury demand) (bfw).
May 31, 2006 3 CERTIFICATE OF MAILING by the Clerk re 2 Order Reassigning Case (bfw)
May 31, 2006 2 Featured Case ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge William R. Wilson, Jr. for all further proceedings. Judge George Howard, Jr. no longer assigned to case.(bfw)
May 30, 2006 Attorney Jonathan Rosen added for Robert Steinbuch (jap)
May 30, 2006 Set Flags re jury, Magistrate (jap)
May 30, 2006 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against all defendants (Filing fee $350.00/receipt #LIT000872) filed by Robert Steinbuch; summons issued and returned to counsel(jap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steinbuch v. Cutler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Steinbuch
Represented By: Jonathan S. Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Cutler
Represented By: Philip S. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hyperion Books
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disney Publishing Worldwide
Represented By: Clayborne S. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner
Represented By: Claire Shows Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Box Office
Represented By: Claire Shows Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?