First National Bank & Trust Company of Mountain Home v. Stonebridge Life Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv00898
Filed: July 31, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: William R. Wilson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 4, 2009 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Motion to Stay Execution and Enforcement of Orders and Judgment; denying 185 Motion for Cash Supersedeas Bond. Defendant must file the $300,000.00 supersedeas bond from Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland by 5 p.m., Friday, August 14, 2009. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 8/4/09. (dac)
July 20, 2009 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 165 Motion for Attorney Fees in the amount of $53,505.00 and Costs in the amount of $7,577.29 from Defendant Minnesota Life. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 7/20/09. (dac)
November 19, 2008 151 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of First National Bank & Trust Company of Mountain Home against Floyd Knighton pursuant to 149 Jury Verdict; the Clerk of Court is directed to pay forthwith to First National Bank and Trust Company as Special Administrator for the Estate of Debra Knighton Deceased the funds interpled together with interest earned; a hearing on the merits of the ERISA claim of Minnesota Life Insurance Company will be held and an amended ERISA scheduling Order will be issued within thirty days of this judgment; the Plaintiff shall recover its costs of suit to be taxed by the Court against the defendant Floyd Knighton.. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/19/08. (mkf)
November 4, 2008 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Re: General Order 54 regarding the use of electronic equipment in the courtroom. Signed by Judge William R. Wilson, Jr on 11/4/08. (mkf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First National Bank & Trust Company of Mountain Home v. Stonebridge Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?