Deceuninck North America LLC v. Bavarian Polymers USA Inc et al

Case Number: 4:2006cv00951
Filed: August 10, 2006
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 1, 2009 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER vacating 71 Preservation Order and withdrawing 67 MOTION for Order to Show Cause and for Protective Order filed by Deceuninck North America LLC, and directing the Clerk to administratively terminate this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 4/1/09. (bkp)
November 20, 2008 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Motion for Reconsideration 152 and directing the parties to proceed with the imaging, and to complete any additional discovery no later than April 6, 2009. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/20/08. (bkp)
December 19, 2006 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER noting that the parties have reached a settlement of this case pursuant to the terms and conditions set out in Exhibit 1 to this Order (UNDER SEAL) and denying all pending motions as moot. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of the settlement agreement until such time as the entry of the consent judgment. Signed by Judge James M Moody on 12/19/06. (bkp) (Docket text modified on 12/20/2006 to clarify the findings as stated in the Order.) (thd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deceuninck North America LLC v. Bavarian Polymers USA Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?